EP0599059 - Start-up method and apparatus for continuous casting of metal into strip product [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.11.1997 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.01.1998 [1998/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Reynolds Metals Company Reynolds Metals Building, 6601 West Broad Street Richmond Virginia 23230-1701 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/34] | For all designated states REYNOLDS METALS COMPANY Reynolds Metals Building, 6601 West Broad Street Richmond, Virginia 23230-1701 / US | ||
Former [1994/22] | For all designated states REYNOLDS METALS COMPANY Reynolds Metals Buildings Richmond, VA 23200 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hensley, John A. 103 Williamsburg Circle Hot Springs, Arkansas 71901 / US | 02 /
Stone, James L. 14 Oakwood Avenue, No. 68 Hot Springs, Arkansas 71913 / US | 03 /
Key, James C. 107 Grand Ridge Drive Hot Springs, Arkansas 71091 / US | 04 /
Sloan, George A. 133 Elaine Drive Hot Springs, Arkansas 71913 / US | [1994/22] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/22] | Reinhard - Skuhra - Weise & Partner Friedrichstrasse 31 D-80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93117043.5 | 21.10.1993 | [1994/22] | Priority number, date | US19920979105 | 23.11.1992 Original published format: US 979105 | [1994/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0599059 | Date: | 01.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0599059 | Date: | 16.10.1996 | [1996/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.08.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B22D11/06, B22D11/08, C22C21/00 | [1996/40] | CPC: |
B22D11/0611 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1994/22] | B22D11/06, B22D11/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1994/22] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Anfahren beim Stranggiessen von Metallband | [1994/22] | English: | Start-up method and apparatus for continuous casting of metal into strip product | [1994/22] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour le démarrage d'une coulée continue de bandes métalliques | [1994/22] | Examination procedure | 17.04.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/02] | 13.08.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1998/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 27.05.1997 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JPS61219447 ; | [YA]WO8907025 (NAT ALUMINUM CORP [US]) [Y] 1,3,11-16 * page 28 - page 30; figures 1-4 * [A] 2,4-10; | [Y]EP0127578 (ALUSUISSE [CH]) [Y] 1,11 * page 5 - page 6; claims 1,4,7 *; | [Y]JPH05935860 ; | [A]US4934443 (HONEYCUTT III LEROY [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * column 3, line 24 - column 7, line 5; figures 1-3 * | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870221), vol. 11, no. 57, Database accession no. (M - 564)<2504>, & JP61219447 A 19860929 (NIPPON KOKAN K.K.) [X] 1 * abstract * * figure * [Y] 3,11-16 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840623), vol. 8, no. 136, Database accession no. (M - 304)<1573>, & JP5935860 A 00000000 (MATSUSHITA DENKO K.K.) [Y] 1,11 * abstract * |