EP0608491 - Pressure relief valve for large rate of flow [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.03.1998 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RICHARD VOSS GRUBENAUSBAU GMBH Gustav-Heinemann-Strasse 41 58239 Schwerte / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/31] | For all designated states RICHARD VOSS GRUBENAUSBAU GMBH Gustav-Heinemann-Strasse 41 D-58239 Schwerte / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Voss, Richard Gustav-Heinemann-Strasse 27 D-58239 Schwerte / DE | 02 /
Voss, Wolfgang Gustav-Heinemann-Strasse 27 D-58239 Schwerte / DE | [1997/21] |
Former [1994/31] | 01 /
Voss, Richard 27, Gustav-Heinemann-Strasse D-58239 Schwerte / DE | ||
02 /
Voss, Wolfgang 27, Gustav-Heinemann-Strasse D-58239 Schwerte / DE | Representative(s) | Schulte, Jörg Schulte & Schulte Patentanwälte Hauptstrasse 2 45219 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/31] | Schulte, Jörg, Dipl.-Ing. Hauptstrasse 2 D-45219 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 93117201.9 | 23.10.1993 | [1994/31] | Priority number, date | DE19934302080 | 27.01.1993 Original published format: DE 4302080 | [1994/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0608491 | Date: | 03.08.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0608491 | Date: | 21.05.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.03.1994 | Classification | IPC: | F16K17/10, E21D15/51 | [1994/31] | CPC: |
F16K17/105 (EP,US);
F16K17/046 (EP,US);
Y10T137/7766 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1994/31] | Title | German: | Grossvolumiges Druckbegrenzungsventil | [1994/31] | English: | Pressure relief valve for large rate of flow | [1994/31] | French: | Limiteur de pression à débit volumineux | [1994/31] | Examination procedure | 11.08.1994 | Examination requested [1994/41] | 19.10.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.02.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.11.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.02.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 25.02.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.02.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.11.1996 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   25.11.1996 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 21.05.1997 | ES | 21.05.1997 | FR | 21.05.1997 | GR | 21.05.1997 | IT | 21.05.1997 | NL | 21.05.1997 | PT | 21.08.1997 | SE | 21.08.1997 | AT | 23.10.1997 | LU | 23.10.1997 | BE | 31.10.1997 | CH | 31.10.1997 | LI | 31.10.1997 | [2007/04] |
Former [2006/14] | DK | 21.05.1997 | |
ES | 21.05.1997 | ||
FR | 21.05.1997 | ||
GR | 21.05.1997 | ||
IT | 21.05.1997 | ||
NL | 21.05.1997 | ||
PT | 21.08.1997 | ||
SE | 21.08.1997 | ||
AT | 23.10.1997 | ||
LU | 23.10.1997 | ||
CH | 31.10.1997 | ||
LI | 31.10.1997 | ||
Former [2004/38] | DK | 21.05.1997 | |
ES | 21.05.1997 | ||
GR | 21.05.1997 | ||
IT | 21.05.1997 | ||
NL | 21.05.1997 | ||
PT | 21.08.1997 | ||
SE | 21.08.1997 | ||
FR | 17.10.1997 | ||
AT | 23.10.1997 | ||
LU | 23.10.1997 | ||
BE | 31.10.1997 | ||
CH | 31.10.1997 | ||
LI | 31.10.1997 | ||
Former [2003/08] | DK | 21.05.1997 | |
ES | 21.05.1997 | ||
GR | 21.05.1997 | ||
IT | 21.05.1997 | ||
NL | 21.05.1997 | ||
PT | 21.08.1997 | ||
SE | 21.08.1997 | ||
FR | 17.10.1997 | ||
AT | 23.10.1997 | ||
BE | 31.10.1997 | ||
CH | 31.10.1997 | ||
LI | 31.10.1997 | ||
LU | 31.10.1997 | ||
Former [2002/26] | DK | 21.05.1997 | |
ES | 21.05.1997 | ||
GR | 21.05.1997 | ||
IT | 21.05.1997 | ||
PT | 21.08.1997 | ||
SE | 21.08.1997 | ||
FR | 17.10.1997 | ||
AT | 23.10.1997 | ||
BE | 31.10.1997 | ||
CH | 31.10.1997 | ||
LI | 31.10.1997 | ||
LU | 31.10.1997 | ||
Former [2000/05] | DK | 21.05.1997 | |
GR | 21.05.1997 | ||
IE | 21.05.1997 | ||
IT | 21.05.1997 | ||
PT | 21.08.1997 | ||
SE | 21.08.1997 | ||
FR | 17.10.1997 | ||
AT | 23.10.1997 | ||
BE | 31.10.1997 | ||
CH | 31.10.1997 | ||
LI | 31.10.1997 | ||
LU | 31.10.1997 | ||
Former [1999/42] | DK | 21.05.1997 | |
IE | 21.05.1997 | ||
IT | 21.05.1997 | ||
PT | 21.08.1997 | ||
SE | 21.08.1997 | ||
FR | 17.10.1997 | ||
AT | 23.10.1997 | ||
BE | 31.10.1997 | ||
CH | 31.10.1997 | ||
LI | 31.10.1997 | ||
Former [1999/22] | DK | 21.05.1997 | |
IE | 21.05.1997 | ||
PT | 21.08.1997 | ||
SE | 21.08.1997 | ||
FR | 17.10.1997 | ||
AT | 23.10.1997 | ||
BE | 31.10.1997 | ||
CH | 31.10.1997 | ||
LI | 31.10.1997 | ||
Former [1999/16] | DK | 21.05.1997 | |
IE | 21.05.1997 | ||
PT | 21.08.1997 | ||
SE | 21.08.1997 | ||
FR | 17.10.1997 | ||
BE | 31.10.1997 | ||
CH | 31.10.1997 | ||
LI | 31.10.1997 | ||
Former [1998/50] | DK | 21.05.1997 | |
PT | 21.08.1997 | ||
SE | 21.08.1997 | ||
FR | 17.10.1997 | ||
BE | 31.10.1997 | ||
CH | 31.10.1997 | ||
LI | 31.10.1997 | ||
Former [1998/49] | DK | 21.05.1997 | |
PT | 21.08.1997 | ||
SE | 21.08.1997 | ||
FR | 17.10.1997 | ||
BE | 31.10.1997 | ||
Former [1998/19] | BE | 21.05.1997 | |
DK | 21.05.1997 | ||
PT | 21.08.1997 | ||
SE | 21.08.1997 | ||
FR | 17.10.1997 | ||
Former [1998/15] | BE | 21.05.1997 | |
DK | 21.05.1997 | ||
PT | 21.08.1997 | ||
SE | 21.08.1997 | ||
Former [1998/12] | BE | 21.05.1997 | |
PT | 21.08.1997 | ||
SE | 21.08.1997 | ||
Former [1998/10] | BE | 21.05.1997 | |
PT | 21.08.1997 | ||
Former [1998/03] | PT | 21.08.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1182921 (VON ROLL AG) [A] 1 * figure 1 *; | [YA]DE2547646 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT) [Y] 1 * figure 1 * [A] 2-4; | [A]DE2949629 (BENNES MARREL) [A] 1 * page 4, line 24; figure 1; claim 1 *; | [DA]DE3314837 (DAMS JOERN); | [A]DE3637888 (GEWERK EISENHUETTE WESTFALIA [DE]) [A] 6-9 * figure 1 *; | [A]WO9103621 (VOSS RICHARD GRUBENAUSBAU [DE]) [A] 1,5 * figure 4; claims 1,2,9 *; | [DYA]DE3929094 (VOSS RICHARD GRUBENAUSBAU [DE]) [DY] 1 * figure 1; claims 7,8 * [DA] 5,9; | [A]DE4030386 (SCHRUPP GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * figure 1 * |