EP0595285 - Hinge for the articulated and separable junction of two panels of a sectional door [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.12.1998 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gumpp, Martin Bahnhofstrasse 14 D-86850 Fischach / DE | [1994/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1994/18] | Representative(s) | Liebau, Gerhard Patentanwaltsbüro Liebau & Liebau Postfach 31 02 60 86063 Augsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/18] | Liebau, Gerhard, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwaltsbüro Liebau & Liebau Postfach 22 02 29 D-86182 Augsburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 93117389.2 | 27.10.1993 | [1994/18] | Priority number, date | DE19920014706U | 29.10.1992 Original published format: DE 9214706 U | [1994/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0595285 | Date: | 04.05.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0595285 | Date: | 18.02.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.1994 | Classification | IPC: | E05D1/04, E05D15/24, E06B3/48 | [1994/18] | CPC: |
E05D1/04 (EP);
E06B9/15 (EP);
E05Y2900/132 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1994/18] | Title | German: | Scharnier zur gelenkigen, aushängbaren Verbindung zweier benachbarter Flügelfelder eines Sektional-Tores | [1994/18] | English: | Hinge for the articulated and separable junction of two panels of a sectional door | [1994/18] | French: | Charnière pour la jonction articulée et séparable de deux lames d'une porte sectionnelle | [1994/18] | Examination procedure | 18.10.1994 | Examination requested [1994/52] | 04.01.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.06.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.01.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 02.07.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 05.08.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.11.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 03.11.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.11.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 18.02.1998 | FR | 18.02.1998 | GB | 18.02.1998 | GR | 18.02.1998 | IT | 18.02.1998 | NL | 18.02.1998 | DK | 18.05.1998 | PT | 18.05.1998 | SE | 18.05.1998 | IE | 24.09.1998 | AT | 27.10.1998 | LU | 27.10.1998 | BE | 31.10.1998 | CH | 31.10.1998 | LI | 31.10.1998 | [2008/05] |
Former [2006/14] | ES | 18.02.1998 | |
FR | 18.02.1998 | ||
GB | 18.02.1998 | ||
GR | 18.02.1998 | ||
IT | 18.02.1998 | ||
NL | 18.02.1998 | ||
DK | 18.05.1998 | ||
PT | 18.05.1998 | ||
SE | 18.05.1998 | ||
IE | 24.09.1998 | ||
AT | 27.10.1998 | ||
LU | 27.10.1998 | ||
BE | 31.10.1998 | ||
CH | 31.10.1998 | ||
LI | 31.10.1998 | ||
Former [2004/38] | ES | 18.02.1998 | |
GB | 18.02.1998 | ||
GR | 18.02.1998 | ||
IT | 18.02.1998 | ||
NL | 18.02.1998 | ||
DK | 18.05.1998 | ||
PT | 18.05.1998 | ||
SE | 18.05.1998 | ||
FR | 17.07.1998 | ||
IE | 24.09.1998 | ||
AT | 27.10.1998 | ||
LU | 27.10.1998 | ||
BE | 31.10.1998 | ||
CH | 31.10.1998 | ||
LI | 31.10.1998 | ||
Former [2003/45] | ES | 18.02.1998 | |
GB | 18.02.1998 | ||
GR | 18.02.1998 | ||
IT | 18.02.1998 | ||
NL | 18.02.1998 | ||
DK | 18.05.1998 | ||
PT | 18.05.1998 | ||
SE | 18.05.1998 | ||
FR | 17.07.1998 | ||
IE | 24.09.1998 | ||
AT | 27.10.1998 | ||
BE | 31.10.1998 | ||
CH | 31.10.1998 | ||
LI | 31.10.1998 | ||
LU | 31.10.1998 | ||
Former [2003/08] | ES | 18.02.1998 | |
GB | 18.02.1998 | ||
GR | 18.02.1998 | ||
IT | 18.02.1998 | ||
NL | 18.02.1998 | ||
PT | 18.05.1998 | ||
SE | 18.05.1998 | ||
FR | 17.07.1998 | ||
IE | 24.09.1998 | ||
AT | 27.10.1998 | ||
BE | 31.10.1998 | ||
CH | 31.10.1998 | ||
LI | 31.10.1998 | ||
LU | 31.10.1998 | ||
Former [2002/26] | ES | 18.02.1998 | |
GB | 18.02.1998 | ||
GR | 18.02.1998 | ||
IT | 18.02.1998 | ||
PT | 18.05.1998 | ||
SE | 18.05.1998 | ||
FR | 17.07.1998 | ||
IE | 24.09.1998 | ||
AT | 27.10.1998 | ||
BE | 31.10.1998 | ||
CH | 31.10.1998 | ||
LI | 31.10.1998 | ||
LU | 31.10.1998 | ||
Former [2002/10] | GB | 18.02.1998 | |
GR | 18.02.1998 | ||
IT | 18.02.1998 | ||
PT | 18.05.1998 | ||
SE | 18.05.1998 | ||
FR | 17.07.1998 | ||
IE | 24.09.1998 | ||
AT | 27.10.1998 | ||
BE | 31.10.1998 | ||
CH | 31.10.1998 | ||
LI | 31.10.1998 | ||
LU | 31.10.1998 | ||
Former [2000/52] | GB | 18.02.1998 | |
GR | 18.02.1998 | ||
IE | 18.02.1998 | ||
IT | 18.02.1998 | ||
PT | 18.05.1998 | ||
SE | 18.05.1998 | ||
FR | 17.07.1998 | ||
AT | 27.10.1998 | ||
BE | 31.10.1998 | ||
CH | 31.10.1998 | ||
LI | 31.10.1998 | ||
LU | 31.10.1998 | ||
Former [2000/24] | GB | 18.02.1998 | |
GR | 18.02.1998 | ||
IE | 18.02.1998 | ||
IT | 18.02.1998 | ||
PT | 18.05.1998 | ||
SE | 18.05.1998 | ||
FR | 17.07.1998 | ||
AT | 27.10.1998 | ||
BE | 31.10.1998 | ||
LU | 31.10.1998 | ||
Former [2000/23] | GB | 18.02.1998 | |
GR | 18.02.1998 | ||
IE | 18.02.1998 | ||
IT | 18.02.1998 | ||
PT | 18.05.1998 | ||
SE | 18.05.1998 | ||
FR | 17.07.1998 | ||
BE | 31.10.1998 | ||
LU | 31.10.1998 | ||
Former [2000/05] | GB | 18.02.1998 | |
GR | 18.02.1998 | ||
IE | 18.02.1998 | ||
IT | 18.02.1998 | ||
PT | 18.05.1998 | ||
SE | 18.05.1998 | ||
FR | 17.07.1998 | ||
LU | 31.10.1998 | ||
Former [1999/42] | GB | 18.02.1998 | |
IE | 18.02.1998 | ||
IT | 18.02.1998 | ||
PT | 18.05.1998 | ||
SE | 18.05.1998 | ||
FR | 17.07.1998 | ||
Former [1999/16] | GB | 18.02.1998 | |
IE | 18.02.1998 | ||
PT | 18.05.1998 | ||
SE | 18.05.1998 | ||
FR | 17.07.1998 | ||
Former [1999/02] | GB | 18.02.1998 | |
PT | 18.05.1998 | ||
SE | 18.05.1998 | ||
FR | 17.07.1998 | ||
Former [1998/52] | PT | 18.05.1998 | |
SE | 18.05.1998 | ||
FR | 17.07.1998 | ||
Former [1998/47] | PT | 18.05.1998 | |
SE | 18.05.1998 | ||
Former [1998/43] | SE | 18.05.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]GB2157752 (ROLKAN NV) [YD] 1-7 * page 2, line 101 - line 109; figure 4 *; | [A]DE3904918 (WAGNER MARIA ANNA [AT]) [A] 1,6,7* column 2, line 29 - column 4, line 19; figures 5,6 *; | [Y]EP0370376 (HOERMANN KG [DE]) [Y] 1-7 * column 4, line 15 - column 6, line 11; figure 2 *; | [A]DE8915709U (NIEMETZ TORSYSTEME) [A] 5 * page 5, line 21 - page 7, line 3; figure 1 * |