EP0596411 - Composite ultrafiltration membrane [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.09.1997 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.10.1997 [1997/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MILLIPORE CORPORATION 80 Ashby Road, P.O. Box 9125 Bedford, MA 01730-9125 / US | [1994/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bellantoni, Ellen C. 608 Windsor Drive Framingham, MA / US | 02 /
Loya, Robert S. 402 Merrimack Street Newburyport, MA / US | [1994/19] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/19] | Henkel, Feiler, Hänzel & Partner Möhlstrasse 37 D-81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93117495.7 | 28.10.1993 | [1994/19] | Priority number, date | US19920971425 | 04.11.1992 Original published format: US 971425 | [1994/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0596411 | Date: | 11.05.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0596411 | Date: | 25.01.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.12.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B01D69/12, B01D71/26, B01D71/68, B01D69/02 | [1994/19] | CPC: |
B01D71/68 (EP,US);
B01D69/12 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1352 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1362 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1366 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1376 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1994/19] | Title | German: | Zusammengesetzte Ultrafiltrationsmembran | [1994/19] | English: | Composite ultrafiltration membrane | [1994/19] | French: | Membrane d'ultrafiltration composite | [1994/19] | Examination procedure | 16.02.1995 | Examination requested [1995/16] | 04.07.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.11.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.06.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.12.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.04.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/43] | 23.05.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1997/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US4824568 [ ]; | [X]EP0165077 (NITTO ELECTRIC IND CO [JP]); | [A]EP0237251 (ICI PLC [GB]); | [DA]EP0245863 (MILLIPORE CORP [US]); | [A]US5028337 (LINDER CHARLES [IL], et al); | [X]ATE72409T (ICI PLC [GB]) |