EP0608494 - Rotation detector, particularly for a volume measuring device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.07.2000 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.07.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.08.2000 [2000/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Techem Aktiengesellschaft & Co. Saonestrasse 1 60528 Frankfurt / DE | [1999/32] |
Former [1994/31] | For all designated states TECHEM AG Saonestrasse 1 D-60528 Frankfurt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Binkle, Markus, Dipl.-Ing. Rossbergstrasse 38 D-55283 Nierstein / DE | [1994/31] | Representative(s) | Schubert, Siegmar, et al Patentanwälte Dannenberg Schubert Gudel Grosse Eschenheimer Strasse 39 60313 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/09] | Schubert, Siegmar, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Dr. Weinhold, Dannenberg, Dr. Gudel, Schubert Grosse Eschenheimer Strasse 39 D-60313 Frankfurt / DE | ||
Former [1994/31] | Gudel, Diether, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Dr. Weinhold, Dannenberg, Dr. Gudel, Schubert Grosse Eschenheimer Strasse 39 D-60313 Frankfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 93117551.7 | 29.10.1993 | [1994/31] | Priority number, date | DE19934301966 | 26.01.1993 Original published format: DE 4301966 | [1994/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0608494 | Date: | 03.08.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0608494 | Date: | 20.09.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0608494 | Date: | 15.09.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.07.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G01F1/05, G01P3/48, G01P13/02, G01P3/488 | [1995/36] | CPC: |
G01P13/045 (EP);
G01P3/4802 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1994/31] | G01F1/05 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, IT, LI, NL [1994/31] | Title | German: | Umdrehungsdetektor, insbesondere für ein Volumenmessteil | [1994/31] | English: | Rotation detector, particularly for a volume measuring device | [1994/31] | French: | Détecteur de rotation, particulièrement pour un dispositif de mesure du volume | [1994/31] | Examination procedure | 12.03.1996 | Examination requested [1996/19] | 21.07.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.11.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.02.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 04.02.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.06.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2911420 (HUGHES MICROELECTRONICS LTD) [A] 1* figures 2-4; claims 1,9 *; | [Y]EP0080056 (VACUUMSCHMELZE GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-3,5,7,13 * page 2 - page 4; figure 1 *; | [A]DE3213854 (VDO SCHINDLING [DE]) [A] 11 * abstract *; | [DY]DE3923398 (PROF. DR. H. ZIEGLER) [DY] 1-3,5,7,13 * column 7 - column 9; figures 1-6 * |