EP0596438 - Method of solidifying filter residues containing heavy metals [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.02.1995 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.1995 | Withdrawal of application | published on 05.04.1995 [1995/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SONDERABFALLVERWERTUNGS-AG SOVAG Bernstrasse 5 CH-3110 Münsingen / CH | [1994/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schindler, Hans-Georg Hangstrasse 8 CH-6373 Ennetbürgen / CH | [1994/19] | Representative(s) | Troesch Scheidegger Werner AG Patentanwälte Postfach 8032 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1994/19] | Troesch Scheidegger Werner AG Patentanwälte, Siewerdtstrasse 95, Postfach CH-8050 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 93117668.9 | 02.11.1993 | [1994/19] | Priority number, date | CH19920003449 | 06.11.1992 Original published format: CH 344992 | [1994/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0596438 | Date: | 11.05.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0596438 | Date: | 15.02.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.01.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B09B3/00, C03C1/00 | [1994/19] | CPC: |
C03C1/002 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1994/19] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Verfestigung von Schwermetall-enthaltenden Filterrückständen | [1994/19] | English: | Method of solidifying filter residues containing heavy metals | [1994/19] | French: | Procédé de solidification de résidus de filtrage contenant des métaux lourds | [1994/19] | File destroyed: | 10.08.2001 | Examination procedure | 07.02.1995 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1995/14] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO9014899 (INDAG STEIRISCHE MAGNESIT-INDUSTRIE) [X] 1,3,4,7,10-12 * page 1, line 3 - page 2, line 20 * * page 3, line 4 - line 35 * * claims 1-7 * [Y] 8; | [Y]DE3737371 (W. BLOCK) [Y] 8 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0445030 (NATIONAL RECOVERY TECHNOLOGIES INC.) [X] 1,2,11,12 * page 4, line 20 - line 34 * * page 6, line 5 - line 17 *; | [X]JPS5120776 ; | [X]JPS5879581 ; | [X]JPH026890 ; | [X]JPS57132582 ; | [X]JPS56166980 | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 76, no. 14, Database accession no. 76-25471X, & JPS5120776 A 19760219 (KAWASAKI JUKOGYO) [X] 1,3-5,7,11,12 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830728), vol. 7, no. 171, Database accession no. (C - 178), & JP58079581 A 19830513 (YOKOHAMASHICHIYOU) [X] 1,3-5,7 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900314), vol. 14, no. 134, Database accession no. (C - 701), & JP02006890 A 19900111 (KUBOTA) [X] 1,2,6 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19821117), vol. 6, no. 231, Database accession no. (C - 135), & JP57132582 A 19820816 (KOBE SEIKOSHO) [X] 1,3,4 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19820409), vol. 6, no. 54, Database accession no. (C - 97), & JP56166980 A 19811222 (NIIGATA ENG.) [X] 1,2,5 * abstract * |