EP0600246 - Biaxially oriented propylene polymer film or sheet articles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 07.07.2000 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2000 | Revocation of patent | published on 23.08.2000 [2000/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MONTELL NORTH AMERICA INC. 2801 Centerville Road, P.O. Box 15439 Wilmington Delaware 19850-5439 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/29] | For all designated states MONTELL NORTH AMERICA INC. 2801 Centerville Road, P.O. Box 15439 Wilmington Delaware 19850-5439 / US | ||
Former [1994/23] | For all designated states HIMONT INCORPORATED 2801 Centerville Road, P.O. Box 15439 Wilmington Delaware 19850-5439 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ogale, Kumar 110 Brook Run, New Castle County Hockessin, Delaware 19707 / US | [1994/23] | Representative(s) | Mai, Oppermann & Partner i.L. Patentanwälte Postfach 3929 65029 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/41] | Luderschmidt & Partner Patentanwälte, Postfach 3929 65029 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [1994/23] | Dr. Fuchs, Dr. Luderschmidt Dr. Mehler, Dipl.-Ing Weiss Patentanwälte Postfach 46 60 D-65036 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 93117737.2 | 02.11.1993 | [1994/23] | Priority number, date | US19920984743 | 03.12.1992 Original published format: US 984743 | [1994/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0600246 | Date: | 08.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0600246 | Date: | 21.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.03.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B32B27/32 | [1994/23] | CPC: |
B32B27/32 (EP,KR,US);
B32B27/08 (KR,US);
B32B2250/242 (KR);
B32B2307/518 (KR,US);
B32B2307/718 (US);
Y10S428/91 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1994/23] | Title | German: | Film-oder Plattenförmige Gegenstände aus biaxial orientiertem Polypropylen | [1994/23] | English: | Biaxially oriented propylene polymer film or sheet articles | [1994/23] | French: | Articles en film ou feuille de polypropylène biaxiallement orienté | [1994/23] | Examination procedure | 04.11.1994 | Examination requested [1995/01] | 06.12.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.06.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.01.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.02.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.07.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.09.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 20.09.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
20.10.1998
ADMISSIBLE Mobil Oil Corporation 3225 Gallows Road, Fairfax Virginia 22037 / US Opponent's representative Lawrence, Peter Robin Broughton Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | [1998/50] | 27.11.1998 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 20.04.1999 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 28.03.2000 | Date of oral proceedings | 28.03.2000 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2000/34] | 06.04.2000 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 06.04.2000 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0339804 (EXXON CHEMICAL PATENTS INC [US]) [Y] 1-13 * page 3, line 34 - line 36 * * page 4, line 48 - line 49 * * page 7, line 23 - line 29; claim - * * & US-A-4950720 *; | [A]WO9114718 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [A] 1-13* claim 1 *; | [A]EP0463406 (BASF AG [DE]) [A] 1-13 * claim - *; | [Y]EP0477662 (HIMONT INC [US]) [Y] 1-13 * page 8, line 14 - line 43 * * page 14, line 1 - line 15; claim 1; table - * | Examination | US5286791 |