EP0599101 - Recyclable floor covering [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.02.1997 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.02.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.03.1997 [1997/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Brüningstrasse 50 65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/22] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Brüningstrasse 50 D-65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schwarz, Gerhard Mellanseestrasse 41 D-63456 Hanau / DE | 02 /
Weber, Manfred Alfred-Teves-Strasse 13 D-61479 Glashütten / DE | [1994/22] | Application number, filing date | 93117745.5 | 02.11.1993 | [1994/22] | Priority number, date | DE19924237199 | 04.11.1992 Original published format: DE 4237199 | [1994/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0599101 | Date: | 01.06.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0599101 | Date: | 03.04.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.03.1994 | Classification | IPC: | D06N7/00, A47G27/02, B32B27/36, B32B7/12, B32B5/26, C09J167/02 | [1994/22] | CPC: |
B32B5/26 (EP,US);
B32B38/164 (US);
B32B5/022 (US);
C08L67/025 (EP,US);
C09J167/025 (EP,US);
D06N7/0073 (EP,US);
D06N7/0081 (EP,US);
B32B2037/148 (US);
B32B2262/0276 (US);
B32B2262/0284 (US);
B32B2307/718 (US);
B32B2307/72 (US);
B32B2309/02 (US);
B32B2471/02 (US);
D06N2201/02 (EP,US);
D06N2205/06 (EP,US);
D06N2209/146 (EP,US);
D06N2209/1621 (EP,US);
D06N2209/1628 (EP,US);
D06N2209/1685 (EP,US);
D06N2211/066 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C09J167/025, C08L67/025 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, LI [1994/22] | Title | German: | Wiederverwertbarer Teppichboden | [1994/22] | English: | Recyclable floor covering | [1994/22] | French: | Moquette recyclable | [1994/22] | Examination procedure | 24.06.1994 | Examination requested [1994/34] | 16.05.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 02.10.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 09.10.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.01.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 19.01.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.01.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3941904 (HOH GEORGE LOK KWONG, et al) [A] 1,2 * & DE 216367; column 1, line 15 - column 6, line 62; claims 1,2 ** column 12, line 22 - column 14, line 28 *; | [A]GB1455091 (TOYO BOSEKI) [A] 1,11 * page 1, line 46 - page 3, line 37; examples 1,12,14,18,19; claims 1,9,10,12 *; | [XY]GB2097005 (TOYO BOSEKI) [X] 1 * & DE-A-3048159; page 2, line 43 - page 3, line 16; claims 1-5; table - * * page 4, line 64 - page 5, line 14 * [Y] 1,3-5,7,10-12; | [Y]EP0511469 (HUELS CHEMISCHE WERKE AG [DE]) [Y] 1,3-5,10,11 * page 2, line 6 - line 27; examples A,B,C; claims 1,5,8,9,11 * * page 3, line 3 - line 58 *; | [PY]EP0529575 (BASF CORP [US]) [PY] 1,3-5,10,11 * column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 24; figures 1,2; examples 1,2; claims 1,2,4,11,12 * * column 2, line 52 - column 4, line 55 *; | [PY]EP0536670 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [PY] 1,7,11,12 * column 1, line 41 - column 4, line 31; claims 1-8,12 * * column 5, line 39 - column 6, line 54 *; | [PX]EP0547533 (AMOCO FABRICS ZWEIGNIEDERLASSU [DE]) [PX] 1-7,10,11 * column 3, line 1 - column 4, line 31; figure .; claims 1,2,9,11,12 * * column 5, line 39 - line 51 *; | [PX]WO9312285 (PEGULAN TARKETT AG [DE]) [PX] 1-13 * example 2; claims 1,3-5,7,9-11 * |