EP0597430 - Check book issuing machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.02.1999 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 16.12.2009 [2009/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LAUREL BANK MACHINES CO., LTD. 1-2, Toranomon 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/20] | For all designated states LAUREL BANK MACHINES CO., LTD. 1-2, Toranomon 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chiba, Hiroshi 851-11, Angyoryo-Negishi Kawagushi-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | 02 /
Ebihara, Hideyuki Maison S-D, 20-8, Nishi-Kawaguchi 2-chome Kawaguchi-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | 03 /
Hanata, Masaaki 2698, Ooaza-Daimon Urawa-shi Saitama-ken / JP | [1994/20] | Representative(s) | Zinnecker, Armin, et al Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Zinnecker, Armin, et al Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte - Patentanwälte Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1994/20] | Zinnecker, Armin, Dipl.-Ing., et al Lorenz-Seidler-Gossel, Widenmayerstrasse 23 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93118095.4 | 08.11.1993 | [1994/20] | Priority number, date | JP19920302292 | 12.11.1992 Original published format: JP 30229292 | [1994/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0597430 | Date: | 18.05.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0597430 | Date: | 22.04.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.03.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G06K17/00, G06K5/00, B42D5/02 | [1994/20] | CPC: |
G06K17/00 (EP,US);
B42D5/021 (EP,US);
G06K5/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1994/20] | Title | German: | Maschine zur Ausgabe von Scheckbüchern | [1994/20] | English: | Check book issuing machine | [1994/20] | French: | Machine à délivrer des carnets de chèques | [1994/20] | Examination procedure | 21.06.1994 | Examination requested [1994/34] | 23.09.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.10.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.12.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 04.12.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.01.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3692298 (PEACOCK JACK) [A] 1,2,9,11 * claims 1,4 *; | [A]US4196846 (BLANTON JOHN F [US], et al) [A] 6* claim 2 *; | [A]GB2073661 (TRANSACTION TECHNOLOGY INC) [A] 1,2 * claims 18,20,22,26-31,40,43,44 * * claims 48,50,62,65 *; | [A]EP0115189 (NCR CANADA [CA]) [A] 1 * claim 1 *; | [A]US4596332 (GENSIKE KARL H [US], et al) [A] 6 * claim 1 *; | [A]FR2613286 (MONTGAILLARD ANDRE [MC]) [A] 1,2 * page 2, line 28 - line 32 *; | [A]US4906026 (GORDON JR MELVIN T [US], et al) [A] 2 * column 1, line 40 - line 44 *; | [DA]EP0441964 (LAUREL BANK MACHINE CO [JP]) [DA] 1 * columns 1-3 * |