EP0599127 - Parasitic resistance compensation for a thermal print head [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.06.1998 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.07.1998 [1998/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/22] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hauschild, Edward, c/o EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | [1994/22] | Representative(s) | Schmidt, Peter, et al KODAK Aktiengesellschaft Patentabteilung 70323 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/22] | Schmidt, Peter, Dipl.-Ing., et al KODAK Aktiengesellschaft Patentabteilung D-70323 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 93118179.6 | 10.11.1993 | [1994/22] | Priority number, date | US19920981045 | 24.11.1992 Original published format: US 981045 | [1994/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0599127 | Date: | 01.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0599127 | Date: | 07.12.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0599127 | Date: | 06.08.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.10.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/36 | [1994/22] | CPC: |
B41J2/36 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1994/22] | Title | German: | Kompensation des parasitären Widerstands für Thermodruckkopf | [1994/22] | English: | Parasitic resistance compensation for a thermal print head | [1994/22] | French: | Compensation de résistance parasite pour tête d'impression thermique | [1994/22] | Examination procedure | 11.05.1995 | Examination requested [1995/27] | 02.10.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.01.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.04.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 18.04.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.05.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US4827281 (LUBINSKY ANTHONY R [US], et al) [X] 1-3,15,16 * column 2, line 41 - line 60 * * column 4, line 1 - column 5, line 35; figures 3-9 * [A] 4-14,17; | [XA]EP0452928 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [X] 1-3,15,16 * column 2, line 9 - line 16 * * column 7, line 3 - column 9, line 27; figures 1-11C * [A] 4-14,17; | [A]US4573058 (BROOKS RALF M [CA]) [A] 1-17 * column 1, line 62 - column 2, line 22 * * column 3, line 55 - column 5, line 50; figures 2-5 *; | [AD]US5053790 (STEPHENSON STANLEY W [US], et al) [AD] 1,2,15,17 * column 2, line 38 - column 3, line 28 * * column 3, line 65 - column 8, line 4; figures 1-9 *; | [A]US4322733 (MORIGUCHI HARUHIKO, et al) [A] 1,2,15,17 * column 2, line 5 - line 56 * * column 3, line 16 - column 4, line 36; figures 1-4 * |