EP0600274 - Roller skate with braking device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1994/23] | Braking device particularly for skates | ||
[1998/18] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.03.1999 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 19.02.2003 [2003/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Benetton Sportsystem S.p.A. Via Montebelluna 5/7 31040 Trevignano (Treviso) / IT | [1997/50] |
Former [1994/23] | For all designated states NORDICA S.p.A Via Montebelluna 5/7 I-31040 Trevignano (Treviso) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zorzi, Claudio Via Dei Fanti 17 I-31050 Paderno di Ponzano Veneto / IT | 02 /
Edauw, Peter Via degli Alpini 31/1 I-31020 San Zenone Degli Ezzelini / IT | 03 /
Marconato, Luca Via Ortigara 74 I-31030 Padernello di Paese / IT | [1994/23] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Guido, et al Dr. Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1994/23] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Modiano & Associati S.r.l. Via Meravigli, 16 I-20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 93118202.6 | 10.11.1993 | [1994/23] | Priority number, date | IT1992TV00149 | 30.11.1992 Original published format: IT TV920149 | IT1992TV00151 | 30.11.1992 Original published format: IT TV920151 | [1994/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0600274 | Date: | 08.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0600274 | Date: | 29.04.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A63C17/14 | [1994/23] | CPC: |
A63C17/1409 (EP,US);
A63C17/1436 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1994/23] | Title | German: | Rollschuh mit Bremsvorrichtung | [1998/18] | English: | Roller skate with braking device | [1998/18] | French: | Patin à roulettes avec dispositif de freinage | [1998/18] |
Former [1994/23] | Bremsvorrichtung besonders für Rollschuhe | ||
Former [1994/23] | Braking device particularly for skates | ||
Former [1994/23] | Dispositif de freins en particulier pour patins à roulettes | Examination procedure | 25.11.1994 | Examination requested [1995/04] | 17.05.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.10.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 10.11.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 10.01.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.10.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.06.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.10.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.01.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 23.01.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.01.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/16] | Request for further processing for: | 13.11.1995 | Request for further processing filed | 17.11.1995 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.12.1995 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 29.04.1998 | NL | 29.04.1998 | GB | 10.11.1998 | [2003/08] |
Former [2000/03] | BE | 29.04.1998 | |
GB | 10.11.1998 | ||
Former [1999/27] | BE | 29.04.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4300781 (RIGGS DENNIS D) [AD] 1,3-16 * column 1, line 50 - column 2, line 10; figures 1,2 *; | [A]WO8903712 (MURGA JOSE [CH]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US4943072 (HENIG SY) [A] 1,3,4 * figures 1,6 *; | [AP]EP0567948 (NORDICA SPA [IT]) [AP] 1* abstract * | other | DE69853 | DE100282 | DE215734 | DE223485 | NZ29446 | US182835 | US906281 | US920848 | US926646 | US1050490 | GB111302 | US1371623 | US1379250 | US1402010 | US1456881 | GB203813 | US1497224 | US1524286 | DE438462 | US1801205 | FR791911 | US2179592 | GB609453 | DE857006 | US3288251 | GB1161623 | JPS4910672 | FR2212162 | FR2228511 | US4033596 | FR2358907 | US4088334 | DE2800695 | GB1523896 | BE868847 | DE2730235 | US4168076 | DE2925555 | US4275895 | DE8119669U | EP0243560 | CA2007890 | EP0379906 | FR2666239 |