EP0597465 - Catheter for dilating stenotic lesions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.12.2000 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 01.10.2008 [2008/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Scimed Life Systems, Inc. 8200 SciMed Place Maple Grove, Minnesota 55311 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/20] | For all designated states SciMed Life Systems, Inc. 8200 SciMed Place Maple Grove, Minnesota 55311 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wijai, Bandula 1903 Carriage Creek Friendswood TX 77456 / US | 02 /
Angelini, Paolo 1568 Kirby Drive Houston TX 77099 / US | [1994/20] | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner Röss, Kaiser, Polte Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | ||
Former [1994/20] | KUHNEN, WACKER & PARTNER Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 D-85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 93118227.3 | 20.09.1988 | [1994/20] | Priority number, date | US19870100363 | 23.09.1987 Original published format: US 100363 | [1994/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0597465 | Date: | 18.05.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0597465 | Date: | 09.02.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.03.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A61M29/02 | [1994/20] | CPC: |
A61M25/104 (EP,US);
A61M25/00 (KR);
A61M25/1002 (EP,US);
A61M29/00 (KR);
A61M2025/0006 (EP,US);
A61M2025/0081 (EP,US);
A61M2025/1059 (EP,US);
A61M2025/1079 (EP,US);
A61M2025/1093 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1994/20] | Title | German: | Katheter zur Dilatation von stenosischen Schäden | [1994/20] | English: | Catheter for dilating stenotic lesions | [1994/20] | French: | Cathéter pour dilater des lésions sténotiques | [1994/20] | Examination procedure | 25.11.1993 | Examination requested [1994/20] | 13.09.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.01.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.11.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.08.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.02.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.04.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.08.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.08.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.11.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 02.11.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP88909045.2 / EP0383794 | Opposition(s) | 10.11.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 28.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB156674 (BERGMANN ELEK CITATS WERKE AG) [A] 2-4,7 * the whole document *; | [A]US3924634 (TAYLOR GLENN M, et al) [A] 1* column 2, line 60 - column 3, line 25; figure 2 *; | [A]GB2172205 (SMITHS INDUSTRIES PLC) [A] 3-7 * the whole document *; | [A]WO8700442 (MEADOX SURGIMED AS [DK]) [A] 2-7 * the whole document *; | [A]US4692148 (KANTROWITZ ADRIAN [US], et al) [A] 2,3,7 * the whole document *; | [PX]EP0260711 (MANSFIELD SCIENT INC [US]) [PX] 1 * column 16, line 27 - line 30 * |