EP0597482 - A portable facsimile apparatus into which a document or a recording sheet is manually set [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.02.2001 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/20] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tsukamoto, Takeshi, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 3-30-2 Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Kenmochi, Toshio, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 3-30-2 Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Ezumi, Yosuke, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 3-30-2 Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Toyoda, Hisashi, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 3-30-2 Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [1994/20] | Representative(s) | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, et al TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/14] | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner, Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [1994/20] | Bühling, Gerhard, Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93118312.3 | 11.11.1993 | [1994/20] | Priority number, date | JP19920302546 | 12.11.1992 Original published format: JP 30254692 | JP19920302548 | 12.11.1992 Original published format: JP 30254892 | [1994/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0597482 | Date: | 18.05.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0597482 | Date: | 22.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.02.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/32 | [1994/20] | CPC: |
H04N1/32702 (EP,US);
H04N1/32795 (EP,US);
H04N2201/0096 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1994/20] | Title | German: | Tragbares Faksimilegerät, in welchem ein Dokument oder ein Aufzeichnungsblatt manuell eingelegt wird | [1994/20] | English: | A portable facsimile apparatus into which a document or a recording sheet is manually set | [1994/20] | French: | Dispositif de fac-similé portable dans lequel est placé un document ou un support d'enregistrement | [1994/20] | Examination procedure | 04.10.1994 | Examination requested [1994/48] | 23.10.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.04.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.1998 | Date of oral proceedings | 04.03.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 04.03.1998 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 04.05.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.09.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.12.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 29.12.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Appeal following examination | 23.04.1998 | Appeal received No. T0752/98 | 10.07.1998 | Statement of grounds filed | 20.01.1999 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [1999/04] | 25.01.1999 | Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [1999/04] | 09.02.1999 | Result of appeal procedure: continuation of examination procedure | Divisional application(s) | EP98101632.2 / EP0841807 | Opposition(s) | 23.12.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 22.03.2000 | FR | 22.03.2000 | IT | 22.03.2000 | GB | 11.11.2000 | [2008/05] |
Former [2006/14] | ES | 22.03.2000 | |
FR | 22.03.2000 | ||
GB | 11.11.2000 | ||
Former [2002/26] | ES | 22.03.2000 | |
FR | 18.08.2000 | ||
GB | 11.11.2000 | ||
Former [2002/12] | FR | 18.08.2000 | |
GB | 11.11.2000 | ||
Former [2001/16] | FR | 18.08.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]GB2166619 (CANON KK) [X] 1-3,5,11,13,14 * page 4, line 43 - page 5, line 77 * [Y] 4,12; | [XY]EP0289005 (SHARP KK [JP]) [X] 6,7,9,10,15,16,18,19 * column 4, line 50 - column 7, line 30 * [Y] 8,17; | [X]JPS63142958 ; | [Y]JPH04301940 ; | [A]JPS63262954 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19881026), vol. 12, no. 403, Database accession no. (E - 674), & JP63142958 A 19880615 (SHARP CORP) [X] 6,9,10,15,18,19 * abstract * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930316), vol. 17, no. 125, Database accession no. (E - 1332), & JP04301940 A 19921026 (CANON INC) [Y] 4,8,12,17 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890228), vol. 13, no. 86, Database accession no. (E - 720), & JP63262954 A 19881031 (NISSEI OPUTO KK) [A] 1-10 * abstract * |