EP0601354 - Dicyanate prepolymers, use and preparation thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 14.01.2000 Database last updated on 09.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 01.10.2008 [2008/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/24] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Papathomas, Konstantinos I. 75 Coventry Road Endicott, New York 13760 / US | [1994/24] | Representative(s) | Rach, Werner, et al IBM Deutschland Management & Business Support GmbH Patentwesen u. Urheberrecht 71137 Ehningen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/13] | Rach, Werner, Dr., et al IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH, Patentwesen und Urheberrecht D-70548 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1994/38] | Schäfer, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing. IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH Patentwesen und Urheberrecht D-70548 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1994/24] | Mönig, Anton, Dipl.-Ing. IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH, Patentwesen und Urheberrecht D-70548 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 93118438.6 | 15.11.1993 | [1994/24] | Priority number, date | US19920987605 | 09.12.1992 Original published format: US 987605 | [1994/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0601354 | Date: | 15.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0601354 | Date: | 17.08.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0601354 | Date: | 18.09.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.06.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H05K1/03, H01B3/30, C08G73/00, C08G73/06 | [1994/24] | CPC: |
C08G73/0655 (EP,US);
H05K1/0346 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31547 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31601 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1994/24] | Title | German: | Dicyanatpräpolymere, ihre Verwendung und Herstellung | [1994/24] | English: | Dicyanate prepolymers, use and preparation thereof | [1994/24] | French: | Prépolymères de dicyanate, leur utilisation et préparation | [1994/24] | Examination procedure | 21.10.1994 | Examination requested [1994/50] | 21.03.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.06.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.02.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.02.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 23.02.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
14.06.1997
ADMISSIBLE Lonza AG Münchensteinerstrasse 38 CH-4002 Basel / CH | [1997/33] | 25.07.1997 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 30.09.1999 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 10.10.1999 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2000/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DE | 19.12.1996 | FR | 30.11.1997 | [2008/40] |
Former [1997/17] | DE | 19.12.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0449593 (HI TEK POLYMERS INC [US]) [A] 1,9,11 * examples 3,4; table 1 *; | [PA]EP0528171 (IBM [US]) [PA] 1,6,9,10 * page 4, line 3 - line 31; example .; claims 1,2,6,7 *; | [PA]EP0560084 (IBM [US]) [PA] 1,9,10 * page 4, line 28 - page 5, line 4; claims 1,3 * | [A] - ANONYMOUS, "New Bisphenol Dicyanate Monomers for Cyclotrimerisation by Reacting Cyanogen Bromide with Bisphenol P or Bisphenol M in Presence of Triethylamine", DATABASE WPI, 2, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 90, no. 45, Database accession no. 90-340382 [A] 1,9,10 * abstract * | [ ] - RESEARCH DISCLOSURE, HAVANT GB, (19901010), vol. 318, no. 033, page 821 |