EP0607526 - Method and device for correcting the measuring signals of a fibre gyroscope [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.09.1997 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.11.1997 [1997/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Daimler-Benz Aerospace Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 80 11 09 81663 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/12] | For all designated states Daimler-Benz Aerospace Aktiengesellschaft D-81663 München / DE | ||
Former [1994/30] | For all designated states Deutsche Aerospace AG Postfach 80 11 09 D-81663 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Poisel, Hans, Prof. Dr. Pühlhof 14 D-91227 Leinburg / DE | 02 /
Trommer, Gert, Dr. Conollystrasse 16 D-80809 München / DE | [1994/30] | Application number, filing date | 93118692.8 | 20.11.1993 | [1994/30] | Priority number, date | DE19934301479 | 21.01.1993 Original published format: DE 4301479 | [1994/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0607526 | Date: | 27.07.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0607526 | Date: | 20.11.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.04.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G01C19/72 | [1994/30] | CPC: |
G01C19/725 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1994/30] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Korrigieren der Messsignale eines Faserkreisels | [1994/30] | English: | Method and device for correcting the measuring signals of a fibre gyroscope | [1994/30] | French: | Méthode et dispositif pour corriger les signaux de mesure d'un gyroscope à fibre | [1994/30] | Examination procedure | 29.06.1994 | Examination requested [1994/34] | 28.03.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.04.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.05.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 14.05.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.08.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DY]DE3926313 (MESSERSCHMITT BOELKOW BLOHM [DE]) [DY] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP0486766 (MESSERSCHMITT BOELKOW BLOHM [DE]) [Y] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [DA] - D.B.MORTIMORE, "Monolithic 4x4 Single-Mode Fused Coupler", ELECTRONICS LETTERS., STEVENAGE GB, (19890511), vol. 25, no. 10, pages 682 - 683, XP000205250 [DA] 1 * the whole document * |