EP0601430 - Waste composting process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.02.1998 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.12.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 24.01.2007 [2007/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SÜDDEUTSCHE ETNA-WERK GMBH Einsteinstrasse 104 D-81675 München / DE | [1994/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hartwig, Manfred Eichendorffstrasse 16 D-85567 Grafing / DE | 02 /
Dürner, Gustav Phantasiestrasse 35 D-81827 München / DE | [1994/24] | Representative(s) | Strasse, Joachim, et al Strasse & Hofstetter Balanstrasse 57 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/24] | Strasse, Joachim, Dipl.-Ing., et al Strasse, Vonnemann & Partner Balanstrasse 55 D-81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93119194.4 | 29.11.1993 | [1994/24] | Priority number, date | DE19924241894 | 11.12.1992 Original published format: DE 4241894 | [1994/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0601430 | Date: | 15.06.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0601430 | Date: | 09.04.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.03.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C05F17/00, C05F17/02 | [1994/24] | CPC: |
C05F17/00 (EP);
C05F17/60 (EP);
C05F17/90 (EP);
Y02P20/145 (EP);
Y02W30/40 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1994/24] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Kompostieren von Abfällen | [1994/24] | English: | Waste composting process | [1994/24] | French: | Procédé de compostage de déchets | [1994/24] | Examination procedure | 28.11.1994 | Examination requested [1995/04] | 11.05.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.09.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.05.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.09.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.11.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 18.11.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.01.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 09.04.1997 | GR | 09.04.1997 | NL | 09.04.1997 | PT | 09.07.1997 | LU | 29.11.1997 | BE | 30.11.1997 | [2007/04] |
Former [2004/38] | ES | 09.04.1997 | |
GR | 09.04.1997 | ||
NL | 09.04.1997 | ||
PT | 09.07.1997 | ||
LU | 29.11.1997 | ||
BE | 30.11.1997 | ||
Former [2002/26] | ES | 09.04.1997 | |
GR | 09.04.1997 | ||
NL | 09.04.1997 | ||
PT | 09.07.1997 | ||
BE | 30.11.1997 | ||
LU | 30.11.1997 | ||
Former [2000/05] | GR | 09.04.1997 | |
IE | 09.04.1997 | ||
NL | 09.04.1997 | ||
PT | 09.07.1997 | ||
BE | 30.11.1997 | ||
LU | 30.11.1997 | ||
Former [1999/16] | IE | 09.04.1997 | |
NL | 09.04.1997 | ||
PT | 09.07.1997 | ||
BE | 30.11.1997 | ||
Former [1998/49] | NL | 09.04.1997 | |
PT | 09.07.1997 | ||
BE | 30.11.1997 | ||
Former [1998/10] | BE | 09.04.1997 | |
NL | 09.04.1997 | ||
PT | 09.07.1997 | ||
Former [1998/03] | NL | 09.04.1997 | |
PT | 09.07.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH03232437 ; | [A]CA2008525 | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 91, no. 48, Database accession no. 91-348964, & JPH03232437 A 19911016 (TAKAYAMA M) [A] 1,4,9,10 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 91, no. 40, Database accession no. 91-288472, & CA2008525 A 19910725 (LYONS D S) [A] 1,4,9,10 * abstract * |