EP0608511 - Utilization of lysolecithins in the treatment of male impotence and alopecia and the relevant compositions suitable for such use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.10.1997 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.10.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.12.1997 [1997/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Arena, Barbara Via Enrico Toti, 22 I-50052 Monza (MI) / IT | For all designated states Guadagnini, Giuseppe Strada della Chiocciola, 25 I-22060 Carimate (CO) / IT | [1994/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1994/31] | Representative(s) | Trupiano, Roberto BREVETTI EUROPA S.r.l. Corso di Porta Ticinese, 3 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1994/31] | Trupiano, Roberto BREVETTI EUROPA S.r.l. Piazza Bernini, 6 I-20133 Milano (MI) / IT | Application number, filing date | 93119208.2 | 29.11.1993 | [1994/31] | Priority number, date | IT1992MI02766 | 03.12.1992 Original published format: IT MI922766 | [1994/31] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0608511 | Date: | 03.08.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0608511 | Date: | 07.09.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.07.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/00, A61K31/685 | [1994/31] | CPC: |
A61K31/685 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, LI, NL [1994/31] | Title | German: | Verwendung von Lysolecithinen zur Behandlung männlicher Impotenz und der Alopezie und zeignete Zusammensetzungen für eine derartige Verwendung | [1994/31] | English: | Utilization of lysolecithins in the treatment of male impotence and alopecia and the relevant compositions suitable for such use | [1994/31] | French: | Utilisation des lysolecithines dans le traitement de l'impotence masculine et de l'alopécie, et compositions adaptées pour telle utilisation | [1994/31] | Examination procedure | 02.03.1995 | Examination requested [1995/20] | 03.06.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/50] | 02.07.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1997/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1996 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS61171407 ; | [X]JPS61291514 ; | [XY]US4927629 (BING RICHARD J [US]) [XY] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [X]DE4113346 (LANG ERICH [DE]) [X] 2-7 * page 2, line 1 - line 10 * * page 2, line 21 * * page 2, line 60 * * page 3, line 19 - line 20 * * claims 1,5 * | [Y] - N.ENGL.J.MED., (1989), vol. 320, no. 16, pages 1025 - 30 [Y] 1-7 * page 1025, column L, line 12 - line 13 * * page 1029, column L, line 12 - line 28 * * page 1030, column L, line 4 - line 15 * | [X] - GEMETE RES., (1989), vol. 22, no. 2, pages 193 - 204 [X] 1-7 | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, Database accession no. 86-242347, & JPS61171407 A 00000000 (KANEBO) [X] 2-7 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870526), vol. 11, no. 163, Database accession no. (C - 424), & JP61291514 A 19861222 (KONDO MITSUO) [X] 2-7 * abstract * |