EP0622540 - Heating device for an internal combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.08.1997 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.09.1997 [1997/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Firma Carl Freudenberg Höhnerweg 2-4 69469 Weinheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/44] | For all designated states Firma Carl Freudenberg Höhnerweg 2-4 D-69469 Weinheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kurr, Klaus, Dr. Brunnengasse 9 D-69469 Weinheim / DE | 02 /
Meinig, Uwe Ortsstrasse 48 D-69469 Weinheim / DE | 03 /
Spies, Karl-Heinz, Dr. Stettiner Strasse 14 D-69488 Birkenau / DE | [1994/44] | Application number, filing date | 93119407.0 | 02.12.1993 | [1994/44] | Priority number, date | DE19934314283 | 30.04.1993 Original published format: DE 4314283 | [1994/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0622540 | Date: | 02.11.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0622540 | Date: | 25.09.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.08.1994 | Classification | IPC: | F02M31/135 | [1994/44] | CPC: |
F02M31/135 (EP,US);
F05C2225/08 (EP,US);
Y02T10/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1994/44] | Title | German: | Heizmodul für eine Verbrennungskraftmaschine | [1994/44] | English: | Heating device for an internal combustion engine | [1994/44] | French: | Module de chauffage pour un moteur à combustion interne | [1994/44] | Examination procedure | 29.09.1994 | Examination requested [1994/48] | 27.09.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.11.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.03.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.05.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 10.05.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.06.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO9302284 (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS HOLLAND [NL]) [X] 1 * page 1, line 9 - line 30 * * page 3, line 1 - line 21; figures 1-4 * [A] 2,8; | [XP]EP0570919 (DUERRWAECHTER E DR DODUCO [DE]) [XP] 1 * column 3, line 24 - column 4, line 40; figures 1-3 *; | [A]DE3917107 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) |