EP0601474 - Wire-length measuring apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.03.2001 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.05.2001 [2001/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MOLEX INCORPORATED 2222 Wellington Court Lisle, Illinois 60532 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/24] | For all designated states MOLEX INCORPORATED 2222 Wellington Court Lisle Illinois 60532 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sadao, Takahashi Riviere-Machida 303, 111-3, Kogasaka Machida-shi, Tokyo / JP | [1994/24] | Representative(s) | Blumbach · Zinngrebe Patentanwälte PartG mbB Alexandrastraße 5 65187 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/19] | Blumbach, Kramer & Partner Patentanwälte, Sonnenberger Strasse 100 D-65193 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [1994/35] | Blumbach Weser Bergen Kramer Zwirner Hoffmann Patentanwälte Sonnenberger Strasse 100 D-65193 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [1994/24] | Blumbach Weser Bergen Kramer Zwirner Hoffmann Patentanwälte Sonnenberger Strasse 100 D-65193 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 93119408.8 | 02.12.1993 | [1994/24] | Priority number, date | JP19920090238U | 08.12.1992 Original published format: JP 9023892 U | [1996/36] |
Former [1994/24] | JP19920090238 | 08.12.1992 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0601474 | Date: | 15.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0601474 | Date: | 22.11.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0601474 | Date: | 31.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.10.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H01R43/28 | [1994/24] | CPC: |
H01R43/28 (EP,US);
H01B13/0036 (KR);
H01B13/0003 (KR);
H01R43/052 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49174 (EP,US);
Y10T29/53243 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1994/24] | Title | German: | Drahtlängen-Messeinrichtung | [1999/32] | English: | Wire-length measuring apparatus | [1994/24] | French: | Appareil pour la mesure de longueur de fils | [1994/24] |
Former [1994/24] | Drahtlängen Messeinrichtung | Examination procedure | 24.04.1996 | Examination requested [1996/26] | 26.06.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.01.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.08.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.12.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.03.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 09.03.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4370806 (FUNCIK JACK F, et al); | [A]US4551893 (IKEDA YUUJI [JP], et al) |