EP0603606 - Container for thick fluid food [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.05.1996 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.06.1996 [1996/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Brinkmeier, Hans-Ullrich Alsfeldstrasse 23 D-46149 Oberhausen / DE | [1994/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1994/26] | Representative(s) | Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstrasse 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/26] | Cohausz & Florack Patentanwälte Kanzlerstrasse 8a D-40472 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 93119497.1 | 03.12.1993 | [1994/26] | Priority number, date | DE19924244097 | 24.12.1992 Original published format: DE 4244097 | [1994/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0603606 | Date: | 29.06.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0603606 | Date: | 22.03.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B65D1/32, B65D47/14 | [1994/26] | CPC: |
B65D47/147 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1994/26] | Title | German: | Behälter für dickflüssige Nahrungsmittel | [1994/26] | English: | Container for thick fluid food | [1994/26] | French: | Récipient pour nourriture de consistence pâteuse | [1994/26] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 05.05.1995 | Examination requested [1995/27] | 06.06.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.12.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/25] | 22.01.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1996/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2500639 (LERMER) [X] 1,4-8 * the whole document * [Y] 2,3; | [YA]EP0011394 (CONTAINAIRE) [Y] 2 * page 15, line 5 - line 18; figures 1-4 * [A] 1,5,6,8; | [YA]EP0276198 (SAN CARLO GRUPPO ALIMENTARE) [Y] 3,5-8 * column 2, line 45 - line 56; figure 1 * [A] 1; | [XY]FR896503 (KAESEBERG) [X] 1,2,4 * the whole document * [Y] 3,5-8; | [A]DE8909092U (LINGNER + FISHER) [A] 1,4 * figure - *; | [A]US5046646 (STULL) [A] 1,5 * figure 2 *; | [DA]DE8309389U (HERMANN LAUE) |