EP0602484 - Electrically balanced connector assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.12.1999 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 05.11.2003 [2003/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE SIEMON COMPANY 76 Westbury Park Road Watertown, CT 06795 / US | [1994/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Siemon, John A. 87 Mountain Road Woodbury, Connecticut 06798 / US | 02 /
Below, Randy 340 Chesnut Street Cheshire, Connecticut 06410 / US | [1994/25] | Representative(s) | Freylinger, Ernest T. Office Ernest T. Freylinger 234, route d'Arlon B.P. 48 8001 Strassen / LU | [N/P] |
Former [1994/25] | Freylinger, Ernest T. Office de Brevets Ernest T. Freylinger 321, route d'Arlon Boîte Postale 48 L-8001 Strassen / LU | Application number, filing date | 93119576.2 | 04.12.1993 | [1994/25] | Priority number, date | US19920993480 | 18.12.1992 Original published format: US 993480 | [1994/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0602484 | Date: | 22.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0602484 | Date: | 06.09.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0602484 | Date: | 27.01.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.07.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/66, H01R23/00, H01R23/02 | [1995/33] | CPC: |
G02B6/3897 (EP,US);
H01R13/6466 (EP,US);
H05K1/0228 (EP,US);
H01R24/64 (EP,US);
H05K1/115 (EP,US);
H05K1/162 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1994/25] | H01R13/66 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1994/25] | Title | German: | Elektrisch kompensierte Verbinderanordnung | [1994/25] | English: | Electrically balanced connector assembly | [1994/25] | French: | Assemblage de connecteur électriquement équilibré | [1994/25] | Examination procedure | 14.12.1995 | Examination requested [1996/06] | 04.04.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.10.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.04.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.07.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.10.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 26.10.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP98112328.4 / EP0901198 | Opposition(s) | 28.10.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.01.1999 | BE | 27.01.1999 | CH | 27.01.1999 | GR | 27.01.1999 | LI | 27.01.1999 | DK | 27.04.1999 | PT | 27.04.1999 | [2003/45] |
Former [2001/23] | AT | 27.01.1999 | |
BE | 27.01.1999 | ||
CH | 27.01.1999 | ||
GR | 27.01.1999 | ||
LI | 27.01.1999 | ||
PT | 27.04.1999 | ||
Former [2000/52] | AT | 27.01.1999 | |
BE | 27.01.1999 | ||
CH | 27.01.1999 | ||
LI | 27.01.1999 | ||
PT | 27.04.1999 | ||
Former [2000/50] | AT | 27.01.1999 | |
BE | 27.01.1999 | ||
PT | 27.04.1999 | ||
CH | 03.05.1999 | ||
LI | 03.05.1999 | ||
Former [2000/23] | AT | 27.01.1999 | |
BE | 27.01.1999 | ||
PT | 27.04.1999 | ||
Former [2000/21] | AT | 27.01.1999 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4726790 (HADJIS GEORGE C [US]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 55 - column 4, line 25; figure 2 *; | [A]WO8802190 (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]) [A] 5,12,17 * page 3, line 16 - page 5, line 27 ** page 6, line 23 - line 27; figures 1-3 *; | [A]EP0269232 (DU PONT [US]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 49 - column 4, line 9 * * column 4, line 44 - column 5, line 25; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0299563 (DU PONT [US], et al) [A] 1,3 * column 4, line 51 - column 5, line 25; figures 1,2 * |