EP0606585 - Severing- and clamping device for front yarn, for embroidering machines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.07.1998 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.09.1998 [1998/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAURER STICKSYSTEME AG 9320 Arbon / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1994/29] | For all designated states SAURER STICKSYSTEME AG CH-9320 Arbon / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Selm, Livio Bollbach 48 CH-9305 Berg/SG / CH | 02 /
Schreiber, Max Seeblickstrasse 2 CH-9320 Arbon/TG / CH | 03 /
Henz, Jürg Freiestrasse 15a CH-8580 Armriswil/TG / CH | [1994/29] | Representative(s) | Riebling, Peter Patentanwalt Postfach 31 60 88113 Lindau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/29] | Riebling, Peter, Dr.-Ing., Patentanwalt Postfach 31 60 D-88113 Lindau / DE | Application number, filing date | 93119653.9 | 07.12.1993 | [1994/29] | Priority number, date | DE19934300846 | 15.01.1993 Original published format: DE 4300846 | [1994/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0606585 | Date: | 20.07.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0606585 | Date: | 01.02.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0606585 | Date: | 10.09.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.1994 | Classification | IPC: | D05C11/20 | [1994/29] | CPC: |
D05C11/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, IT [1994/29] | Title | German: | Schneide- und Klemmeinrichtung für Vordergarn für Stickmaschinen | [1994/29] | English: | Severing- and clamping device for front yarn, for embroidering machines | [1994/29] | French: | Dispositif pour sectionner et pincer le fil de face dans des machines à broder | [1997/37] |
Former [1994/29] | Dispositif pour sectionner er pincer le fil de face dans des machines à broder | Examination procedure | 25.04.1995 | Examination requested [1995/26] | 24.01.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.03.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.05.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 15.05.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.06.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE226828 (SCHOENFELD) [A] 1,11,12 * page 2, column R, line 89 - line 97; figures 11,12 *; | [DA]CH536893 (METALMECCANICA SPA [IT]); | [DA]CH577587 (PFAFF IND MASCH); | [DA]CH647283 (HEINZLE AUGUST); | [DA]DE3502886 (REICH RUDOLF) |