EP0603664 - Preparation of blend systems by condensation of oligocarbonates in the presence of mass-ABS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.01.1999 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.01.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.03.1999 [1999/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [1998/12] |
Former [1994/26] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nielinger, Werner, Dr. Bärenstrasse 21 D-47802 Krefeld / DE | 02 /
Kauth, Hermann, Dr. Kolpingstrasse 34 D-47829 Krefeld / DE | 03 /
Wittmann, Dieter, Dr. Wolfskaul 4 D-51061 Köln / DE | 04 /
Freitag, Dieter, Dr. Hasenheide 10 D-47802 Krefeld / DE | 05 /
Idel, Karsten-Josef, Dr. Am Schwarzkamp 38 D-47802 Krefeld / DE | [1994/26] | Application number, filing date | 93119862.6 | 09.12.1993 | [1994/26] | Priority number, date | DE19924243525 | 22.12.1992 Original published format: DE 4243525 | [1994/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0603664 | Date: | 29.06.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0603664 | Date: | 23.11.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0603664 | Date: | 18.03.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C08J3/00, C08L69/00, C08L55/02, C08L51/04, C08G64/30 | [1994/26] | CPC: |
C08L55/02 (EP,US);
C08L51/04 (EP,US);
C08L69/00 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L51/04, C08L2666/14 (EP,US);
C08L55/02, C08L2666/14 (US,EP);
C08L69/00, C08L51/00 (US,EP);
C08L69/00, C08L55/02 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, IT, NL [1994/26] | Title | German: | Herstellung von Blendsystemen durch Kondensation von Oligocarbonaten in Gegenwart von Masse-ABS | [1994/26] | English: | Preparation of blend systems by condensation of oligocarbonates in the presence of mass-ABS | [1994/26] | French: | Préparation de systèmes de mélange par condensation d'oligocarbonates en présence de masse-ABS | [1994/26] | Examination procedure | 04.05.1995 | Examination requested [1995/26] | 21.10.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.01.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.06.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.10.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 06.10.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.12.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4526926 (WEBER CHRISTIAN A [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * example 1; claims 1-6 *; | [D]US4624986 (WEBER CHRISTIAN A [US], et al); | [A]DE4039023 (BAYER AG [DE]) [A] 1,2 * claims 1,2 * * column 4, line 27 - line 51 *; | [A]DE1570617 (BAYER AG) [A] 1,2 * claim . * * page 4, paragraph 4 *; | [PA]EP0566313 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [PA] 1,2 * abstract *; | [A]EP0270811 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 1,2 * abstract * * page 2, line 9 - line 26 *; | [A]US4386186 (MARESCA LOUIS M, et al) [A] 1 * claims 1,14,25-28 * |