EP0603689 - Antitheft device for vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.1998 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.08.1998 [1998/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Winner International Royalty Corporation 32 West State Street Sharon Pennsylvania 16146 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/28] | For all designated states Winner International Royalty Corporation 32 West State Street Sharon, Pennsylvania 16146 / US | ||
Former [1994/26] | For all designated states WINNER INTERNATIONAL 32 West State Street Sharon Pennsylvania 16146 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tobias, Marc W. 4317 Town Park Place Sioux Falls, South Dakota 57105 / US | [1994/26] | Representative(s) | Hennicke, Albrecht, et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Buschhoff Dipl.-Ing. Hennicke Dipl.-Ing. Vollbach, Kaiser-Wilhelm-Ring 24 50672 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/26] | Hennicke, Albrecht, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Buschhoff Dipl.-Ing. Hennicke Dipl.-Ing. Vollbach, Kaiser-Wilhelm-Ring 24 D-50672 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 93120024.0 | 11.12.1993 | [1994/26] | Priority number, date | US19920996738 | 23.12.1992 Original published format: US 996738 | [1994/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0603689 | Date: | 29.06.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0603689 | Date: | 10.08.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0603689 | Date: | 03.09.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.06.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B60R25/02 | [1994/26] | CPC: |
B60R25/0225 (EP,US);
B60R25/021 (KR);
Y10T70/5765 (EP,US);
Y10T70/5841 (EP,US);
Y10T70/7932 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1994/26] | Title | German: | Diebstahlsicherung für Fahrzeuge | [1994/26] | English: | Antitheft device for vehicles | [1994/26] | French: | Dispositif anti-vol pour véhicules | [1994/26] | Examination procedure | 11.12.1993 | Examination requested [1994/26] | 23.06.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.10.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.05.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.08.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.01.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.03.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.05.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 28.05.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.06.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US4738127 (JOHNSON CHARLES R [US]) [DA] 1,6-10* column W *; | [DX]US4935047 (WU JINN F [TW]) [DX] 1,6-10 * column 6, line 13 - column 7, line 38 *; | [A]US5131245 (CHEN SHIH-YU [TW]) [A] 1,6-10 * column 3, line 52 - column 4, line 8 * |