EP0622866 - Electrical interconnect system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.03.2000 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.03.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.05.2000 [2000/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304-1112 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/44] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, California 94304 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wilson, Arthur King 11305 Seda Place San Diego, CA 92124 / US | 02 /
Brown, Patricia Susan 2081 Coolngreen Lane Encinitas, CA 92024 / US | 03 /
Arbeiter, Jason R. 14023 Ipava Drive Poway, CA 92064 / US | [1994/44] | Representative(s) | Schoppe, Fritz Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/44] | Schoppe, Fritz, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt, Georg-Kalb-Strasse 9 D-82049 Pullach / DE | Application number, filing date | 93120300.4 | 16.12.1993 | [1994/44] | Priority number, date | US19930056692 | 30.04.1993 Original published format: US 56692 | [1994/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0622866 | Date: | 02.11.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0622866 | Date: | 10.04.1996 | [1996/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0622866 | Date: | 26.05.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.02.1996 | Classification | IPC: | H01R9/07, B41J2/175 | [1996/15] | CPC: |
B41J2/17526 (EP,US);
B41J2/1752 (EP,US);
H01R12/62 (EP,US);
H05K3/365 (EP,US);
H05K1/0393 (EP,US);
H05K2201/0367 (EP,US);
H05K2201/09036 (EP,US);
H05K2201/09045 (EP,US);
H05K2201/091 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1994/44] | H01R9/07 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1994/44] | Title | German: | Elektrisches Verbindungssystem | [1994/44] | English: | Electrical interconnect system | [1994/44] | French: | Système d'interconnection électrique | [1994/44] | Examination procedure | 15.05.1996 | Examination requested [1996/28] | 09.06.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.09.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.12.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.01.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 14.01.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.02.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0073528 (LITTON SYSTEMS INC [US]) [X] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2,4,6; | [XA]EP0240710 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [X] 1 * page 8, line 26 - page 9, line 26; figure 3A * [A] 3; | [A]EP0374476 (IBM [US]) [A] 5* claim 1 * |