EP0604888 - Pump for viscous substances with a rotary gate valve [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.04.1997 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.04.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.06.1997 [1997/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SEDEPRO 230, rue Lecourbe F-75015 Paris / FR | [1994/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Deal, Michel Les Rollats F-03110 St-Remy-en-Rollat / FR | [1994/27] | Representative(s) | Bauvir, Jacques Manufacture Française des Pneumatiques Michelin CBS/CORP/J/PI - F35 - Ladoux 23, place des Carmes-Déchaux 63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 9 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1994/28] | Bauvir, Jacques Michelin & Cie, Service SRK Brevets 23, Place des Carmes F-63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cédex / FR | ||
Former [1994/27] | Bauvir, Jacques Michelin & Cie Service SRK Brevets F-63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 93120650.2 | 22.12.1993 | [1994/27] | Priority number, date | FR19920016053 | 31.12.1992 Original published format: FR 9216053 | [1994/27] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0604888 | Date: | 06.07.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0604888 | Date: | 12.06.1996 | Language: | FR | [1996/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.04.1994 | Classification | IPC: | F04B7/00, F04B15/02 | [1994/27] | CPC: |
F04B7/0007 (EP,US);
F04B13/00 (EP,US);
F04B15/02 (EP,US);
Y10T137/8782 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1994/27] | Title | German: | Dickstoffpumpe mit einem Drehschieberarmatur | [1994/27] | English: | Pump for viscous substances with a rotary gate valve | [1994/27] | French: | Pompe pour matière visqueuse, comportant un organe de distribution rotatif | [1994/27] | Examination procedure | 22.12.1993 | Examination requested [1994/27] | 08.05.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.08.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.09.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.12.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.03.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 25.03.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.03.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.06.1996 | SE | 12.09.1996 | [1997/17] |
Former [1997/03] | AT | 12.06.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR545198 (ANCIENS ETABLISSEMENTS BERGER) [X] 1-3,8 * page 1, line 59 - page 2, line 24; figures 2-3 *; | [AD]EP0400496 (SEDEPRO [FR]) [AD] 1,10* abstract * |