EP0595374 - Arrangement for forming an air bag deployment opening [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.12.1998 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.2009 | Change - representative | published on 24.06.2009 [2009/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TIP ENGINEERING GROUP, INC. 28501 Orchard Lake Road Farmington Hills, MI 48018 / US | [1994/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bauer, David J. 7356 Meadowridge Circle West Bloomfield, MI 48322 / US | [1994/18] | Representative(s) | Schaumburg und Partner Patentanwälte mbB Mauerkircherstraße 31 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/26] | Schaumburg, Thoenes, Thurn, Landskron, Eckert Patentanwälte Postfach 86 07 48 81634 München / DE | ||
Former [1994/18] | Schaumburg, Thoenes & Thurn Postfach 86 07 48 D-81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93120748.4 | 13.07.1990 | [1994/18] | Priority number, date | US19890380156 | 14.07.1989 Original published format: US 380156 | US19900471922 | 23.01.1990 Original published format: US 471922 | [1994/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0595374 | Date: | 04.05.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0595374 | Date: | 04.02.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/20 | [1994/18] | CPC: |
B60R21/2165 (EP);
B29C2035/0838 (EP);
B60R2021/21654 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1994/18] | Title | German: | Anordnung zum Formen einer Öffnung zum Aufblasen eines Luftkissens | [1994/18] | English: | Arrangement for forming an air bag deployment opening | [1994/18] | French: | Aménagement constituant une ouverture pour un déploiement de coussin gonflable | [1994/18] | Examination procedure | 04.11.1994 | Examination requested [1995/01] | 10.11.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.05.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.11.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 08.01.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.08.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.11.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 05.11.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP90113466.8 / EP0408064 | Opposition(s) | 05.11.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3545028 (AUDI AG) [A] 1 * figure . * * abstract * * column 2, line 41 - column 3, line 19 * * column 3, line 59 - column 4, line 60 *; | [A]DE2053565 (VOLKSWAGENWERK AG) [A] 1 * figures 1-4 * * page 3, line 5 - page 4, line 4 *; | [AD]US3632136 (RAMON DOYLE FOLTZ) [AD] 1 * figures 1-4 * * column 1, line 17 - column 3, line 67 * |