EP0604920 - Novel cephalosporin compounds [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.09.1996 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.09.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.11.1996 [1996/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LUCKY LTD. 20, Yoido-dong, Yongdungpo-ku Seoul 150-721 / KR | [1994/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bang, Chan-Sik Lucky Apt. B-208, 386-4, Doryong-Dong, Youseong-Ku Daejeon / KR | 02 /
Kim, Yong-Zu Lucky Hana Apt. 102-401, 153, Shinsung-Dong Youseong-Ku, Daejeon / KR | 03 /
Yeo, Jae-Hong Luck Hana Apt. 107-1505, 153, Shinsung-Dong Youseong-Ku, Daejeon / KR | 04 /
Lim, Jong-Chan Lucky Hana Apt. 103-203, 153, Shinsung-Dong Youseong-Ku, Daejeon / KR | 05 /
Oh, Hun-Seung Lucky Hana Apt. 102-103, 153, Shinsung-Dong Youseong-Ku, Daejeon / KR | 06 /
Woo, Young-Min Lucky Hana Apt. 103-1307, 153, Shinsung-Dong Youseong-Ku, Daejeon / KR | 07 /
Yang, Duk-Ho Lucky Apt. A-405, 386-4, Doryong-Dong, Youseong-Ku Daejeon / KR | 08 /
Kim, Sam-Sik Lucky Apt. A-101, 386-4, Doryong-Dong, Youseong-Ku Daejeon / KR | 09 /
Yim, Hyeon-Joo Hyundae Apt. 105-1101, Youcheon-2-Dong, Jung-Ku Daejeon / KR | [1994/27] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/27] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93120829.2 | 23.12.1993 | [1994/27] | Priority number, date | KR19920025647 | 26.12.1992 Original published format: KR 9225647 | [1994/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0604920 | Date: | 06.07.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.04.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C07D501/36, A61K31/545 | [1994/27] | CPC: |
C07D501/00 (EP,US);
C07D501/36 (KR);
A61P31/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1994/27] | Title | German: | Cephalosporin-Verbindungen | [1994/27] | English: | Novel cephalosporin compounds | [1994/27] | French: | Composés de céphalosporine | [1994/27] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 23.12.1993 | Examination requested [1994/27] | 30.11.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.04.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/45] | 07.06.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1996/45] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1995 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [D]JPS549296 (HOECHST AG); | [AD]FR2426694 (GLAXO GROUP LTD [GB]) [AD] 1,8* claims 1,24 *; | [A]US4278793 (DUERCKHEIMER WALTER, et al) [A] 1,8 * columns 127-133, 140-142; example 85; abstract *; | [A]EP0034760 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [A] 1,8 * example 14; claims 1,5 *; | [DY]EP0248645 (TANABE SEIYAKU CO [JP]) [DY] 1,3,8 * page 18, example no. 21 *;; claims 1,2,16-18 *; | [Y]EP0397511 (LUCKY LTD [KR]) [Y] 1,3,8 * pages 13-24, 28, 30 *;; claims 1,52,60-63 *; | [Y]WO9203445 (LUCKY LTD [KR]) [Y] 1,3,8 * examples 1-4,6-11,13; claims 1,11,14 *; | [A]EP0508375 (LUCKY LTD [KR]) [A] 1,3,8 * claims 1,28,37 * |