EP0603908 - Method of and apparatus for converting image signals [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 10.09.1999 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.09.1999 | Refusal of application | published on 27.10.1999 [1999/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dainippon Screen Mfg. Co., Ltd. 1-1, Tenjinkitamachi Teranouchi-Agaru 4-chome Horikawa-Dori Kamikyo-ku Kyoto 602 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/26] | For all designated states Dainippon Screen Mfg. Co., Ltd. 1-1, Tenjinkitamachi Teranouchi-Agaru 4-chome Horikawa-Dori Kamikyo-ku Kyoto 602 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yonezawa, Yasuharu, c/o Dainippon Scr. MFG. Co Ltd 1-1, Tenjinkitamachi, Teranouchi-agaru 4-chome Horikawa-dori, Kamikyo-ku, Kyoto / JP | [1994/26] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J., et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/26] | Goddar, Heinz J., Dr., et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 D-80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93120852.4 | 23.12.1993 | [1994/26] | Priority number, date | JP19920358193 | 25.12.1992 Original published format: JP 35819392 | JP19930312700 | 17.11.1993 Original published format: JP 31270093 | [1994/27] |
Former [1994/26] | JP19920358193 | 25.12.1992 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0603908 | Date: | 29.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0603908 | Date: | 07.02.1996 | [1996/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/40, G06T5/40, H04N1/407, H04N1/60 | [1996/05] | CPC: |
G06T5/92 (EP);
G06T5/40 (EP);
H04N1/4074 (EP);
H04N1/6027 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1994/26] | H04N1/40 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1994/26] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Gerät zur Bildsignalkonvertierung | [1994/26] | English: | Method of and apparatus for converting image signals | [1994/26] | French: | Méthode et appareil de conversion de signaux d'image | [1994/26] | Examination procedure | 08.05.1996 | Examination requested [1996/27] | 03.04.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.06.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 31.05.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1999/43] | 10.06.1999 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1999/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2161670 (DAINIPPON SCREEN MFG) [A] 1-21 * page 4, line 13 - page 7, line 85 *; | [D]US4679095 (KITAMURA HIDEAKI [JP], et al); | [A]EP0372390 (DAINIPPON SCREEN MFG [JP]) [A] 1-21 * page 4, line 21 - page 8, line 9 *; | [A]EP0430165 (DAINIPPON SCREEN MFG [JP]) [A] 1-21* page 5, line 22 - page 11, line 43 * |