EP0541516 - A hay-making machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.06.1999 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.08.1999 [1999/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states C. van der Lely N.V. Weverskade 10 P.O. Box 26 3155 PD Maasland / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1993/19] | For all designated states C. van der Lely N.V. Weverskade 10 P.O. Box 26 NL-3155 PD Maasland / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
van der Lely, Cornelis 7 Brüschenrain CH-6300 Zug / CH | 02 /
Bom, Cornelis Johannes Gerardus 16 Laan van Nieuw Rozenburg NL-3181 VC Rozenburg / NL | [1993/19] | Representative(s) | Corten, Maurice Jean F.M., et al Octrooibureau Van der Lely N.V. Cornelis van der Lelylaan 1 3147 PB Maassluis / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1998/47] | Corten, Maurice Jean F.M., et al Octrooibureau Van der Lely N.V. Weverskade 10 3155 PD Maasland / NL | ||
Former [1993/19] | Mulder, Herman, et al Octrooibureau Van der Lely N.V. Weverskade 10 NL-3155 PD Maasland / NL | Application number, filing date | 93200034.2 | 10.06.1988 | [1993/19] | Priority number, date | NL19870001461 | 23.06.1987 Original published format: NL 8701461 | NL19880000065 | 12.01.1988 Original published format: NL 8800065 | [1993/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0541516 | Date: | 12.05.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0541516 | Date: | 08.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0541516 | Date: | 19.08.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.07.1993 | Classification | IPC: | A01D78/10, A01B73/04 | [1993/19] | CPC: |
A01B73/042 (EP);
A01D78/1014 (EP);
A01D2075/203 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1993/19] | Title | German: | Heuerntemaschine | [1993/19] | English: | A hay-making machine | [1993/19] | French: | Machine de fenaison | [1993/19] | Examination procedure | 01.03.1994 | Examination requested [1994/20] | 20.11.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.03.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.12.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.08.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.12.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.03.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 13.03.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP88201202.4 / EP0296666 | Divisional application(s) | EP97203888.9 / EP0838146 | Opposition(s) | 20.05.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 03.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 02.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 02.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE8625784U ; | [Y]GB1130838 ; | [A]US2366461 ; | [A]FR2275980 ; | [A]US4093055 |