EP0553910 - Television receiver [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.08.1998 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.09.1998 [1998/39] | Applicant(s) | For:GB
PHILIPS ELECTRONICS UK LIMITED 420-430 London Road Croydon CR9 3QR / GB | For:DE
FR
IT
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1998/35] | For:GB
PHILIPS ELECTRONICS UK LIMITED 420-430 London Road Croydon CR9 3QR / GB | ||
For:DE
FR
IT
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [1997/40] | For:GB
PHILIPS ELECTRONICS UK LIMITED 420-430 London Road Croydon CR9 3QR / GB | ||
For:DE
FR
IT
Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [1993/31] | For:GB
PHILIPS ELECTRONICS UK LIMITED 420-430 London Road Croydon CR9 3QR / GB | ||
For:DE
FR
IT
Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ross, Kevin, c/o Philips Semiconductors Millbrook Industrial Estate Southampton, Hants SO9 7BH / GB | [1993/31] | Representative(s) | Andrews, Arthur Stanley, et al Philips Electronics UK Limited Patents and Trade Marks Department Cross Oak Lane Redhill, Surrey RH1 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/31] | Andrews, Arthur Stanley, et al Philips Electronics UK Limited Patents and Trade Marks Department Cross Oak Lane Redhill, Surrey RH1 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 93200132.4 | 20.01.1993 | [1993/31] | Priority number, date | GB19920001837 | 27.01.1992 Original published format: GB 9201837 | [1993/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0553910 | Date: | 04.08.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0553910 | Date: | 01.10.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/278, H04N7/087, H04N5/445 | [1993/31] | CPC: |
H04N21/4888 (EP,US);
H04N21/47 (EP,US);
H04N7/0882 (EP,US);
H04N7/0884 (EP,US);
H04N7/0885 (EP,US);
H04N9/641 (EP,US);
H04N5/44504 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1993/31] | Title | German: | Fernsehempfänger | [1993/31] | English: | Television receiver | [1993/31] | French: | Récepteur de télévision | [1993/31] | Examination procedure | 19.01.1994 | Examination requested [1994/12] | 18.01.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.07.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.02.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.05.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 22.05.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.07.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/39] | Request for further processing for: | 01.07.1997 | Request for further processing filed | 01.07.1997 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.08.1997 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]EP0486129 (PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORP [JP]); | [X]EP0449106 (FERGUSON LTD [GB]); | [A]EP0408834 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) | [Y] - IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS vol. 37, no. 3, August 1991, NEW YORK US pages 449 - 454 HARIGAI ET AL. 'LSI CHIP SET FOR CLOSED CAPTION DECODER SYSTEM' |