EP0609574 - Highly concentrated alkyl sulphate solutions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition procedure closed Status updated on 07.05.1999 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.05.1999 | Opposition procedure terminated - date of legal effect published | published on 23.06.1999 [1999/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/32] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Blake, Alan David Terblokstraat 64 B-3090 Overijse / BE | 02 /
Geudens, Jozef Philemona Raymond Laarbeeklaan 34 B-1730 Asse, Zellik / BE | 03 /
Mather, Peter Geoffrey rue Américaine 199 B-1050 Brussels / BE | [1994/32] | Representative(s) | Canonici, Jean-Jacques, et al NV Procter & Gamble Services Company SA Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/32] | Canonici, Jean-Jacques, et al Procter & Gamble European Technical Center N.V. Temselaan 100 B-1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | Application number, filing date | 93200287.6 | 04.02.1993 | [1994/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0609574 | Date: | 10.08.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0609574 | Date: | 18.06.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.07.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C07C303/24, C07C305/08, C07C305/04, C11D11/04, C11D1/14 | [1994/32] | CPC: |
C11D11/04 (EP);
C07C303/24 (EP);
C07C305/06 (EP);
C07C305/10 (EP);
C11D1/146 (EP);
C11D1/29 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C07C303/24, C07C305/06 (EP);
C07C303/24, C07C305/10 (EP) | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1997/04] |
Former [1994/32] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Hochkonzentrierte Alkylsulfatlösungen | [1994/32] | English: | Highly concentrated alkyl sulphate solutions | [1994/32] | French: | Solutions de sulfate d'alkyle hautement concentrées | [1994/32] | Examination procedure | 06.02.1995 | Examination requested [1995/14] | 15.03.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.07.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.12.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.02.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 05.02.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
07.03.1998
WITHDRAWN Hüls Infracor GmbH Gewerbliche Schutzrechte Bau 1042 PB 15 D-45764 Marl / DE | [1998/18] | 23.04.1998 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 25.01.1999 | Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed | 04.02.1999 | Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [1999/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]SU740754 ; | [X]SU523136 ; | [X]US4476045 ; | [X]EP0466243 ; | [A]WO9216606 ; | [A]EP0120638 ; | [A]EP0401642 | [X] - DATABASE WPIL Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; AN 81-11286DÄ07Ü & SU-A-740 754 (TULA CHEM IND), & SU740754 A 00000000 | [X] - DATABASE WPI Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; AN 77-19659YÄ11Ü & SU-A-523 136 (AS EST CHEM INST), & SU523136 A 00000000 |