EP0562656 - Mould opening and closing device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.11.1996 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 20.08.2008 [2008/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUSION KUNSTSTOFFEN B.V. Zweedsestraat 61010 NL-7418 BB Deventer / NL | [1993/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
van Tillo, Paulus Hendrik Maria Larenseweg 41 NL-7475 PV Markelo / NL | [1993/39] | Representative(s) | Hooiveld, Arjen Jan Winfried, et al Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | Hooiveld, Arjen Jan Winfried, et al Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [1995/20] | Hooiveld, Arjen Jan Winfried, et al Trenité van Doorne, De Lairessestraat 133 NL-1075 HJ Amsterdam / NL | ||
Former [1993/39] | Vollebregt, Cornelis Jacobus, Ir. Algemeen Octrooibureau World Trade Center P.O. Box 645 NL-5600 AP Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 93200658.8 | 08.03.1993 | [1993/39] | Priority number, date | NL19920000523 | 23.03.1992 Original published format: NL 9200523 | [1993/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0562656 | Date: | 29.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0562656 | Date: | 27.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.06.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B29C33/20, B29C41/04 | [1993/39] | CPC: |
B29C41/04 (EP);
B29C33/22 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1993/39] | Title | German: | Einrichtung zum Öffnen und Schliessen einer Form | [1993/39] | English: | Mould opening and closing device | [1993/39] | French: | Dispositif d'ouverture et de fermeture de moule | [1993/39] | Examination procedure | 16.07.1993 | Examination requested [1993/39] | 11.04.1995 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 29.05.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.05.1995 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 30.06.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.09.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 25.09.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.09.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.12.1995 | BE | 27.12.1995 | CH | 27.12.1995 | DK | 27.12.1995 | ES | 27.12.1995 | FR | 27.12.1995 | GR | 27.12.1995 | IT | 27.12.1995 | LI | 27.12.1995 | MC | 27.12.1995 | IE | 08.03.1996 | PT | 27.03.1996 | SE | 27.03.1996 | DE | 28.03.1996 | LU | 31.03.1996 | [2006/14] |
Former [2003/18] | AT | 27.12.1995 | |
BE | 27.12.1995 | ||
CH | 27.12.1995 | ||
DK | 27.12.1995 | ||
ES | 27.12.1995 | ||
GR | 27.12.1995 | ||
IT | 27.12.1995 | ||
LI | 27.12.1995 | ||
MC | 27.12.1995 | ||
IE | 08.03.1996 | ||
PT | 27.03.1996 | ||
SE | 27.03.1996 | ||
DE | 28.03.1996 | ||
LU | 31.03.1996 | ||
FR | 24.05.1996 | ||
Former [2003/17] | AT | 27.12.1995 | |
BE | 27.12.1995 | ||
CH | 27.12.1995 | ||
DK | 27.12.1995 | ||
ES | 27.12.1995 | ||
GR | 27.12.1995 | ||
IT | 27.12.1995 | ||
LI | 27.12.1995 | ||
IE | 08.03.1996 | ||
MC | 08.03.1996 | ||
PT | 27.03.1996 | ||
SE | 27.03.1996 | ||
DE | 28.03.1996 | ||
LU | 31.03.1996 | ||
FR | 24.05.1996 | ||
Former [2002/26] | AT | 27.12.1995 | |
BE | 27.12.1995 | ||
CH | 27.12.1995 | ||
DK | 27.12.1995 | ||
ES | 27.12.1995 | ||
GR | 27.12.1995 | ||
IT | 27.12.1995 | ||
LI | 27.12.1995 | ||
MC | 27.12.1995 | ||
IE | 08.03.1996 | ||
PT | 27.03.1996 | ||
SE | 27.03.1996 | ||
DE | 28.03.1996 | ||
LU | 31.03.1996 | ||
FR | 24.05.1996 | ||
Former [2001/24] | AT | 27.12.1995 | |
BE | 27.12.1995 | ||
CH | 27.12.1995 | ||
DK | 27.12.1995 | ||
GR | 27.12.1995 | ||
IT | 27.12.1995 | ||
LI | 27.12.1995 | ||
MC | 27.12.1995 | ||
IE | 08.03.1996 | ||
PT | 27.03.1996 | ||
SE | 27.03.1996 | ||
DE | 28.03.1996 | ||
LU | 31.03.1996 | ||
FR | 24.05.1996 | ||
Former [2001/01] | AT | 27.12.1995 | |
BE | 27.12.1995 | ||
CH | 27.12.1995 | ||
DK | 27.12.1995 | ||
GR | 27.12.1995 | ||
IT | 27.12.1995 | ||
LI | 27.12.1995 | ||
IE | 08.03.1996 | ||
PT | 27.03.1996 | ||
SE | 27.03.1996 | ||
DE | 28.03.1996 | ||
LU | 31.03.1996 | ||
FR | 24.05.1996 | ||
Former [2000/05] | AT | 27.12.1995 | |
BE | 27.12.1995 | ||
CH | 27.12.1995 | ||
DK | 27.12.1995 | ||
GR | 27.12.1995 | ||
IT | 27.12.1995 | ||
LI | 27.12.1995 | ||
PT | 27.03.1996 | ||
SE | 27.03.1996 | ||
DE | 28.03.1996 | ||
LU | 31.03.1996 | ||
FR | 24.05.1996 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 27.12.1995 | |
BE | 27.12.1995 | ||
CH | 27.12.1995 | ||
DK | 27.12.1995 | ||
IT | 27.12.1995 | ||
LI | 27.12.1995 | ||
PT | 27.03.1996 | ||
SE | 27.03.1996 | ||
DE | 28.03.1996 | ||
FR | 24.05.1996 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 27.12.1995 | |
BE | 27.12.1995 | ||
CH | 27.12.1995 | ||
DK | 27.12.1995 | ||
LI | 27.12.1995 | ||
PT | 27.03.1996 | ||
SE | 27.03.1996 | ||
DE | 28.03.1996 | ||
FR | 24.05.1996 | ||
Former [1998/14] | AT | 27.12.1995 | |
BE | 27.12.1995 | ||
CH | 27.12.1995 | ||
LI | 27.12.1995 | ||
PT | 27.03.1996 | ||
SE | 27.03.1996 | ||
DE | 28.03.1996 | ||
FR | 24.05.1996 | ||
Former [1997/13] | AT | 27.12.1995 | |
BE | 27.12.1995 | ||
CH | 27.12.1995 | ||
LI | 27.12.1995 | ||
SE | 27.03.1996 | ||
DE | 28.03.1996 | ||
FR | 24.05.1996 | ||
Former [1996/44] | AT | 27.12.1995 | |
BE | 27.12.1995 | ||
SE | 27.03.1996 | ||
DE | 28.03.1996 | ||
FR | 24.05.1996 | ||
Former [1996/42] | AT | 27.12.1995 | |
BE | 27.12.1995 | ||
SE | 27.03.1996 | ||
FR | 24.05.1996 | ||
Former [1996/32] | BE | 27.12.1995 | |
SE | 27.03.1996 | ||
Former [1996/31] | BE | 27.12.1995 | |
Former [N/P] | deleted | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1173486 (V & E PLASTICS LTD); | [AD]US3175250 (ARVID MARLO); | [A]US3856452 (AMADO J); | [A]EP0227365 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]); | [A]GB2235151 (DAY GERALD DENNIS) |