EP0550421 - Optical shunt device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.12.1999 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 19.02.2003 [2003/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/04] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | ||
Former [1997/38] | For all designated states DU PONT OPTO-ELECTRONICS KABUSHIKI KAISHA 4997, Shinyoshida-cho, Kohoku-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 223 / JP | ||
For:DE
FR
GB
IT
MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | |||
Former [1993/27] | For:AT
BE
CH
LI
NL
SE
DU PONT OPTO-ELECTRONICS KABUSHIKI KAISHA 4997, Shinyoshida-cho, Kohoku-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 223 / JP | ||
For:DE
FR
GB
IT
MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tanaka, Toshiyasu, c/o Du Pont Opto Electronics Kabushiki Kaisha, 4997 Shinyoshida-cho, Kohoku-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 223 / JP | 02 /
Kobayashi, Toyohiro, c/o Mitsubishi Denki K. K. Shizuoka Seisakusho, 18-1, Ojika 3-chome Shizuoka-shi, Shizuoka 422 / JP | 03 /
Mukohara, Shouji, c/o Mitsubishi Denki K. K. Shizuoka Seisakusho, 18-1, Ojika 3-chome Shizuoka-shi, Shizuoka 422 / JP | [1993/27] | Representative(s) | Hackett, Sean James, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/04] | Hackett, Sean James, et al MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | ||
Former [1993/27] | Hackett, Sean James MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 93200764.4 | 12.07.1989 | [1993/27] | Priority number, date | JP19880174163 | 13.07.1988 Original published format: JP 17416388 | JP19880174164 | 13.07.1988 Original published format: JP 17416488 | [1993/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0550421 | Date: | 07.07.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0550421 | Date: | 24.08.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0550421 | Date: | 24.02.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H04B10/20 | [1993/27] | CPC: |
G02B6/2804 (EP,US);
H04B10/00 (KR);
G02B6/28 (EP,US);
G02B6/4246 (EP,US);
H04B10/271 (EP,US);
H04B10/278 (EP,US);
G02B6/3562 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1993/27] | Title | German: | Optische Nebenschlussvorrichtung | [1993/27] | English: | Optical shunt device | [1993/27] | French: | Dispositif optique de dérivation | [1993/27] | Examination procedure | 31.03.1993 | Examination requested [1993/27] | 23.04.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.07.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.02.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.07.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.10.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 13.10.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP89908254.9 / EP0378704 | Opposition(s) | 25.11.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 08.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.02.1999 | BE | 24.02.1999 | CH | 24.02.1999 | LI | 24.02.1999 | NL | 24.02.1999 | SE | 24.02.1999 | [2003/08] |
Former [2002/23] | AT | 24.02.1999 | |
BE | 24.02.1999 | ||
CH | 24.02.1999 | ||
LI | 24.02.1999 | ||
SE | 24.02.1999 | ||
Former [2000/52] | AT | 24.02.1999 | |
BE | 24.02.1999 | ||
CH | 24.02.1999 | ||
LI | 24.02.1999 | ||
Former [2000/50] | AT | 24.02.1999 | |
BE | 24.02.1999 | ||
CH | 31.05.1999 | ||
LI | 31.05.1999 | ||
Former [2000/23] | AT | 24.02.1999 | |
BE | 24.02.1999 | ||
Former [2000/21] | AT | 24.02.1999 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JPS56111819 ; | [XAY]DE8508153U (SCHÖNEBECK) [X] 1 * page 4, line 22 - page 5, line 9 * * page 6, line 23 - line 27 * * figure 1 * [A] 2 [Y] 3 | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (1981), vol. 5, no. 185, Database accession no. (P - 91), & JP56111819 A 00000000 (MITSUBISHI) [X] 1 * abstract * [A] 2 | [YA] - KELLER ET AL, "Overlay optical fibre local area network", IEEE GLOBAL TELECOMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE, CONFERENCE RECORD, NEW ORLEANS, US, (198512), vol. 3, pages 3921 - 3925 [Y] 3 * figure 3 * [A] 2 |