EP0612478 - Confectionery fat compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.10.1997 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 06.08.2008 [2008/32] | Applicant(s) | For:AT
BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FR
GR
IT
LI
NL
PT
SE
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | For:GB
IE
Unilever PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London Greater London EC4P 4BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/32] | For:AT
BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FR
GR
IT
LI
NL
PT
SE
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | ||
For:GB
IE
Unilever PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London EC4P 4BQ / GB | |||
Former [1996/50] | For:AT
BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FR
GR
IT
LI
NL
PT
SE
UNILEVER N.V. P.O. Box 760 NL-3000 DK Rotterdam / NL | ||
For:GB
IE
UNILEVER PLC Unilever House Blackfriars P.O. Box 68 London EC4P 4BQ / GB | |||
Former [1994/35] | For:AT
BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FR
GR
IT
LI
NL
PT
SE
UNILEVER N.V. P.O. Box 760 NL-3000 DK Rotterdam / NL | ||
For:GB
IE
UNILEVER PLC Unilever House Blackfriars P.O. Box 68 London EC4P 4BQ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bennett, Jane Caroline 76 Wyndcliff Road Charlton, London SE7 7JY / GB | 02 /
Cain, Frederick William Dr. Blookerstraat 12 NL-2271 VL Voorburg / NL | 03 /
Talbot, Geoffrey 22 The Elms Kempston, Beds MK42 7JW / GB | [1994/35] | Representative(s) | Sikken, Antonius H. J. M., et al Unilever N.V. Unilever Intellectual Property Group Olivier van Noortlaan 120 3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1994/35] | Sikken, Antonius H. J. M., et al UNILEVER N.V., Patent Division, P.O. Box 137 NL-3130 AC Vlaardingen / NL | Application number, filing date | 93200837.8 | 23.03.1993 | [1994/35] | Priority number, date | EP19930301496 | 26.02.1993 Original published format: EP 93301496 | [1994/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0612478 | Date: | 31.08.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0612478 | Date: | 11.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A23G1/00 | [1994/35] | CPC: |
A23G1/38 (EP);
A23D9/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1994/35] | Title | German: | Fettzusammensetzungen für Konfekt | [1994/35] | English: | Confectionery fat compositions | [1994/35] | French: | Compositions grasses de confiserie | [1994/35] | Examination procedure | 27.07.1994 | Examination requested [1994/38] | 08.09.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.11.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.06.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.06.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.06.1996 | Fee for grant paid | Opposition(s) | 12.09.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.12.1996 | CH | 11.12.1996 | DK | 11.12.1996 | ES | 11.12.1996 | GR | 11.12.1996 | LI | 11.12.1996 | NL | 11.12.1996 | PT | 11.03.1997 | [2003/08] |
Former [2002/26] | AT | 11.12.1996 | |
CH | 11.12.1996 | ||
DK | 11.12.1996 | ||
ES | 11.12.1996 | ||
GR | 11.12.1996 | ||
LI | 11.12.1996 | ||
PT | 11.03.1997 | ||
Former [2000/05] | AT | 11.12.1996 | |
CH | 11.12.1996 | ||
DK | 11.12.1996 | ||
GR | 11.12.1996 | ||
LI | 11.12.1996 | ||
PT | 11.03.1997 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 11.12.1996 | |
CH | 11.12.1996 | ||
DK | 11.12.1996 | ||
LI | 11.12.1996 | ||
PT | 11.03.1997 | ||
Former [1997/50] | AT | 11.12.1996 | |
CH | 11.12.1996 | ||
LI | 11.12.1996 | ||
PT | 11.03.1997 | ||
Former [1997/42] | AT | 11.12.1996 | |
CH | 11.12.1996 | ||
LI | 11.12.1996 | ||
Former [1997/29] | CH | 11.12.1996 | |
LI | 11.12.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0293194 (UNILEVER PLC ET AL.) [X] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0502697 (FUJI OIL COMPANY LIMITED) [X] 1,3-5,7 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0451781 (ASAHI DENKA KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA) [X] 1,3-5,7 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0321227 (FUJI OIL COMPANY LIMITED) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]JPS61254143 ; | [A]EP0276548 (MEIJI SEIKA KAISHA LTD.) | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 86, no. 51, Database accession no. 86-337017, & JPS61254143 A 19861111 (FUJI OIL KK ET AL.) [A] 1 * abstract * |