EP0569075 - Method of making tabular silver halide grains [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.01.1999 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.01.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.03.1999 [1999/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agfa-Gevaert N.V. Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/13] | For all designated states AGFA-GEVAERT N.V. Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | ||
Former [1994/01] | For all designated states AGFA-GEVAERT naamloze vennootschap Septestraat 27 B-2640 Mortsel / BE | ||
Former [1993/45] | For all designated states AGFA-GEVAERT naamloze vennootschap Septestraat 27 B-2640 Mortsel / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Van den Zegel, Marc, c/o Agfa-Gevaert N.V. DIE 3811, Septestraat 27 B-2640 Mortsel / BE | 02 /
Mestdagh, Marcel, c/o Agfa-Gevaert N.V. DIE 3811, Septestraat 27 B-2640 Mortsel / BE | [1993/45] | Application number, filing date | 93201136.4 | 20.04.1993 | [1993/45] | Priority number, date | EP19920201259 | 05.05.1992 Original published format: EP 92201259 | [1993/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0569075 | Date: | 10.11.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0569075 | Date: | 25.03.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.08.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G03C1/005 | [1993/45] | CPC: |
G03C1/0051 (EP);
G03C5/16 (EP);
G03C5/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, NL [1993/45] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von tafelförmigen Silberhalogenid-Körnern | [1993/45] | English: | Method of making tabular silver halide grains | [1993/45] | French: | Procédé pour la fabrication de grains d'halogénure d'argent tabulaires | [1993/45] | Examination procedure | 09.04.1994 | Examination requested [1994/23] | 12.05.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.06.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.08.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.09.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.01.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 02.01.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.12.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9118320 ; | [A]US4755456 | [A] - RESEARCH DISCLOSURE vol. 299, March 1989, HAVANT GB pages 185 - 197 ANONYMOUS : 'Nucleation of Tabular Grain Emulsions at High pBr' |