EP0570050 - Process for the dechlorination of higher chloromethanes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.11.1998 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.12.1998 [1998/53] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOLVAY (Société Anonyme) Rue du Prince Albert, 33 1050 Bruxelles / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/27] | For all designated states SOLVAY (Société Anonyme) Rue du Prince Albert, 33 B-1050 Bruxelles / BE | ||
Former [1993/46] | For all designated states SOLVAY & Cie (Société Anonyme) Rue du Prince Albert, 33 B-1050 Bruxelles / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schoebrechts, Jean-Paul Allée des Vignes, 7 B-1390 Grez-Doiceau / BE | 02 /
Janssens, Francine Steenweg op Koningslo, 106 B-1800 Vilvoorde / BE | [1993/46] | Representative(s) | Jacques, Philippe Solvay S.A. Département de la Propriété Industrielle Rue de Ransbeek, 310 1120 Bruxelles / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/22] | Jacques, Philippe Solvay S.A. Département Propriété Industrielle 310, rue de Ransbeek B-1120 Bruxelles / BE | ||
Former [1993/46] | Marckx, Frieda Solvay S.A. Département de la Propriété Industrielle 310, rue de Ransbeek B-1120 Bruxelles / BE | Application number, filing date | 93201259.4 | 04.05.1993 | [1993/46] | Priority number, date | BE19920000444 | 14.05.1992 Original published format: BE 9200444 | [1993/46] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0570050 | Date: | 18.11.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0570050 | Date: | 07.01.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.09.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C07C17/00, C07C1/26, C07C19/04 | [1993/46] | CPC: |
C07C17/23 (EP);
C07C1/26 (EP);
C07C2521/04 (EP);
C07C2523/42 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C07C1/26, C07C9/04 (EP);
C07C17/23, C07C19/03 (EP);
C07C17/23, C07C19/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1993/46] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Dechlorierung von höheren Chlormethanen | [1993/46] | English: | Process for the dechlorination of higher chloromethanes | [1993/46] | French: | Procédé de déchloration des chlorométhanes supérieurs | [1993/46] | Examination procedure | 06.05.1994 | Examination requested [1994/27] | 20.06.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.10.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.04.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.1996 | Date of oral proceedings | 27.12.1996 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 29.01.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.06.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.09.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 22.09.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.10.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/53] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US3579596 (MULLIN CHARLES R, et al); | [AD]EP0455547 (ATOCHEM ELF SA [FR]) |