EP0581340 - Rescue device for bodies, like human beings or cargo, fallen into the sea [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.02.1995 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.04.1995 [1995/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hamm, Paul Lodewijk Arie Parallelweg 70 NL-4283 GS Giessen / NL | [1994/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1994/05] | Representative(s) | Metman, Karel Johannes Octrooibureau Los en Stigter B.V. P.O. Box 20052 1000 HB Amsterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1994/05] | Metman, Karel Johannes Octrooibureau Los en Stigter B.V. P.O.Box 20052 NL-1000 HB Amsterdam / NL | Application number, filing date | 93201360.0 | 11.05.1993 | [1994/05] | Priority number, date | NL19920001389 | 31.07.1992 Original published format: NL 9201389 | [1994/05] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0581340 | Date: | 02.02.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.11.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B63C9/20, B63C9/15, B63C7/26 | [1994/05] | CPC: |
B63C9/23 (EP);
B63C7/26 (EP);
B63C9/08 (EP);
B63C9/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, LI, NL, SE [1994/12] |
Former [1994/05] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Rettungsgerät für in die See gefallene Schiffbrüchige oder Gegenstände | [1994/05] | English: | Rescue device for bodies, like human beings or cargo, fallen into the sea | [1994/05] | French: | Dispositif de sauvetage pour des personnes ou des articles tombés dans la mer | [1994/05] | File destroyed: | 06.08.2001 | Examination procedure | 03.08.1993 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 29.10.1993 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) ES, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, PT | 03.08.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/15] | 14.11.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1995/15] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 03.09.1993 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 03.09.1993 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 03.09.1993 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.09.1993 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 03.09.1993 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 03.09.1993 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 03.09.1993 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 09.09.1994 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3931690 ; | [X]FR2573382 ; | [X]CH643194 ; | [X]US2629115 ; | [X]DE3625812 ; | [X]DE3427805 ; | [Y]GB1172691 ; | [Y]DE2854093 ; | [Y]FR2442180 ; | [A]US5083953 |