EP0572062 - Apparatus for the treatment of agricultural and horticultural products [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.06.1998 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOLSMA TECHNIEK B.V. Fabrieksweg 7 NL-8304 AT Emmeloord / NL | [1993/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tolsma, Pieter Sjoerd Salland 9 NL-8302 JZ Emmeloord / NL | 02 /
Tolsma, Cornelis Marten Oosterom 10 NL-8303 KL Emmeloord / NL | [1993/48] | Representative(s) | Smulders, Theodorus A.H.J., et al Vereenigde Postbus 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1993/48] | Smulders, Theodorus A.H.J., Ir., et al Vereenigde Octrooibureaux Nieuwe Parklaan 97 NL-2587 BN 's-Gravenhage / NL | Application number, filing date | 93201371.7 | 13.05.1993 | [1993/48] | Priority number, date | NL19920000854 | 14.05.1992 Original published format: NL 9200854 | [1993/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0572062 | Date: | 01.12.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0572062 | Date: | 06.08.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.1993 | Classification | IPC: | F26B21/02 | [1993/48] | CPC: |
F26B21/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, DK, ES, FR, GR, IT, NL, PT [1993/48] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Behandlung von Landwirtschafts- und Gartenbauprodukten | [1993/48] | English: | Apparatus for the treatment of agricultural and horticultural products | [1993/48] | French: | Dispositif de traitement de produits agricoles et horticoles | [1993/48] | Examination procedure | 04.02.1994 | Examination requested [1994/14] | 24.07.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.02.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.02.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.07.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.08.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 20.12.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 10.01.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.04.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 10.04.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.05.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 15.06.1993 | BE   M02   Fee paid on   11.08.1993 | 15.06.1993 | DK   M02   Fee paid on   11.08.1993 | 15.06.1993 | GR   M02   Fee paid on   11.08.1993 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 06.08.1997 | IT | 06.08.1997 | PT | 11.11.1997 | [2008/05] |
Former [1999/42] | DK | 06.08.1997 | |
IT | 06.08.1997 | ||
PT | 11.11.1997 | ||
Former [1998/30] | DK | 06.08.1997 | |
PT | 11.11.1997 | ||
Former [1998/24] | PT | 11.11.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CH100004 ; | [AD]US4257169 ; | [A]GB503854 ; | [A]DE32254 ; | [A]US5054291 ; | [A]GB191012467 | Examination | US4458583 | EP0244891 | DE2710254 | - GB-A-K12467 (MACMEIKAN) |