EP0571028 - Display device including a correction circuit for correcting the focussing voltage [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.04.1996 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.06.1996 [1996/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1994/34] | For all designated states Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [1993/47] | For all designated states PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Houben, Paulus Antonius c/o Int. Octrooibureau B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [1993/47] | Representative(s) | Kooiman, Josephus Johannes Antonius, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1993/47] | Kooiman, Josephus Johannes Antonius, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 93201379.0 | 13.05.1993 | [1993/47] | Priority number, date | EP19920201455 | 21.05.1992 Original published format: EP 92201455 | [1993/47] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0571028 | Date: | 24.11.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0571028 | Date: | 13.04.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H04N3/26 | [1993/47] | CPC: |
H04N3/26 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1993/47] | Title | German: | Wiedergabeanordnung mit einer Korrekturschaltung zum Korrigieren der Fokussierspannung | [1993/47] | English: | Display device including a correction circuit for correcting the focussing voltage | [1993/47] | French: | Dispositif de reproduction d'images muni d'un circuit de correction de la tension de focalisation | [1993/47] | File destroyed: | 13.09.2003 | Examination procedure | 01.12.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/23] | 08.01.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1996/23] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 23.11.1994 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1995 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS5713862 ; | [X]US3949166 (YUZO FUSE) [X] 1,2 * column 1, line 51 - line 64 * * column 3, line 16 - line 41; figure 2 *; | [A]US3763316 (YAMAZAKI ET AL.) [A] 3 * claim 1 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19820514), vol. 6, no. 77, Database accession no. (E - 106), & JP57013862 A 19820123 (HITACHI LTD) [X] 1,2 * abstract * |