EP0578292 - A ski boot [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.03.1995 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.03.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.04.1995 [1995/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DOLOMITE S.P.A. Via Feltrina Centro, 3 I-31044 Montebelluna (Treviso) / IT | [1994/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zerbinati, Gianfranco Via B. Ambrosi, 10 I-31044 Montebelluna (Treviso) / IT | [1994/02] | Representative(s) | Cantaluppi, Stefano, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Via Berchet 9 35131 Padova / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1994/02] | Cantaluppi, Stefano, et al c/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A. Via Berchet, 9 I-35131 Padova / IT | Application number, filing date | 93201691.8 | 11.06.1993 | [1994/02] | Priority number, date | IT1992PD00126 | 09.07.1992 Original published format: IT PD920126 | [1994/02] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0578292 | Date: | 12.01.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.10.1993 | Classification | IPC: | A43B5/04 | [1994/02] | CPC: |
A43B5/0474 (EP);
A43B5/0452 (EP);
A43B5/0456 (EP);
A43B5/0476 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, LI [1994/02] | Title | German: | Schischuh | [1994/02] | English: | A ski boot | [1994/02] | French: | Chaussure de ski | [1994/02] | File destroyed: | 04.09.2001 | Examination procedure | 13.07.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/16] | 22.11.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1995/16] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2058969 (RIEKER & CO DR JUSTUS); | [A]DE2807371 (LINTNER DACHSTEIN SPORTSCHUH); | [A]EP0150800 (NORDICA SPA [IT]); | [A]EP0358599 (LANGE INT SA [CH]) |