EP0579308 - Pressure sensor assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.03.1998 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.04.1998 [1998/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DELCO ELECTRONICS CORPORATION 700 East Firmin Street Kokomo Indiana 46902 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/03] | For all designated states DELCO ELECTRONICS CORPORATION 700 East Firmin Street Kokomo Indiana 46902 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Maack, Steven Roy 2626 South 200 Street Kokomo, Indiana 46902 / US | [1994/03] | Representative(s) | Denton, Michael John, et al Delphi France SAS Bât. le Raspail - ZAC Paris Nord 2 22, avenue des Nations CS 65059 Villepinte 95972 Roissy CDG Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1994/51] | Denton, Michael John, et al Patent Section 1st Floor Gideon House 28 Chapel Street Luton Bedfordshire LU1 2SE / GB | ||
Former [1994/03] | Jehan, Robert Patent Section, 1st Floor, Gideon House, 28 Chapel Street Luton, Bedfordshire LU1 2SE / GB | Application number, filing date | 93201890.6 | 29.06.1993 | [1994/03] | Priority number, date | US19920912379 | 13.07.1992 Original published format: US 912379 | [1994/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0579308 | Date: | 19.01.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0579308 | Date: | 07.05.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.11.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G01L19/00 | [1994/03] | CPC: |
G01L19/0007 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1994/03] | Title | German: | Drucksensoreinrichtung | [1994/03] | English: | Pressure sensor assembly | [1994/03] | French: | Assemblage d'un capteur de pression | [1994/03] | Examination procedure | 14.03.1994 | Examination requested [1994/19] | 01.02.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.05.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.08.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.11.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.02.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 18.02.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.02.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1995 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   02.01.1996 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO8103678 (ROSEMOUNT INC [US]) [A] 1-3 * page 5, line 6 - line 24; figures 2,3 * |