EP0587222 - Dry immunoassay elements with a separate absorbent layer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.01.2000 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.01.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.03.2000 [2000/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Johnson & Johnson Clinical Diagnostics, Inc. 100 Indigo Creek Drive Rochester New York 14650 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/38] | For all designated states Johnson & Johnson Clinical Diagnostics, Inc. 100 Indigo Creek Drive Rochester New York 14650 / US | ||
Former [1995/31] | For all designated states CLINICAL DIAGNOSTIC SYSTEMS, INC. 100 Indigo Creek Drive Rochester, New York 14650 / US | ||
Former [1994/11] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Belly, Robert T., c/o Eastman Kodak Co. Patent Dept., 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | 02 /
Kopcienski, Martha M., c/o Eastman Kodak Co. Patent Dept., 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | 03 /
Erdrich, Caroline, c/o Eastman Kodak Co. Patent Dept., 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | 04 /
Kildal, Maurice A., c/o Eastman Kodak Co. Patent Dept., 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [1999/10] |
Former [1994/11] | 01 /
Belly, Robert Troconis, c/o Eastman Kodak Co. Patent Department, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | ||
02 /
Kopcienski, Martha Miller, c/o Eastman Kodak Co. Patent Department, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | |||
03 /
Erdrich, Caroline, c/o Eastman Kodak Co. Patent Department, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | |||
04 /
Kildal, Maurice A., c/o Eastman Kodak Co. Patent Department, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | Representative(s) | Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/31] | Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43, Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [1994/11] | Aufflick, James Neil Kodak Limited Patent Department Headstone Drive Harrow Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | Application number, filing date | 93202509.1 | 26.08.1993 | [1994/11] | Priority number, date | US19920938460 | 31.08.1992 Original published format: US 938460 | [1994/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0587222 | Date: | 16.03.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0587222 | Date: | 01.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0587222 | Date: | 10.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.04.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/558, G01N33/543, G01N33/52 | [1994/11] | CPC: |
G01N33/54386 (EP,US);
G01N33/525 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, NL, SE [1994/11] | Title | German: | Trockene Immunoassay-Elemente mit einer getrennten Absorbierungsschicht | [1994/11] | English: | Dry immunoassay elements with a separate absorbent layer | [1994/11] | French: | Eléments secs avec une couche absorbante séparée pour immunoessais | [1994/11] | Examination procedure | 10.11.1994 | Examination requested [1995/02] | 27.03.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.10.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.04.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.09.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.11.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 13.11.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.12.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0206561 (MUREX CORP [US]); | [A]EP0310406 (E Y LAB INC [US]); | [A]EP0452740 (BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM GMBH [DE]); | [PX]WO9215863 (BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM CORP [US]) |