EP0589515 - Loudspeaker system comprising a plurality of tubes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.12.1999 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.12.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.01.2000 [2000/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1999/04] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [1998/35] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [1994/34] | For all designated states Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [1994/13] | For all designated states PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nieuwendijk, Joris Adelbert Maria c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
Bax, Johannes Wilhelmus Theodorus c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
van den Thillart, Martinus Petrus Maria c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [1994/13] | Representative(s) | Cuppens, Hubertus Martinus Maria, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1999/04] | Cuppens, Hubertus Martinus Maria, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [1994/13] | Van Weele, Paul Johannes Frits, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 93202667.7 | 15.09.1993 | [1994/13] | Priority number, date | EP19920202913 | 23.09.1992 Original published format: EP 92202913 | [1994/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0589515 | Date: | 30.03.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0589515 | Date: | 27.01.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.12.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H04R1/28 | [1994/13] | CPC: |
H04R1/2842 (EP,US);
H04R1/2857 (EP,US);
H04R2499/15 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1994/13] | Title | German: | Lautsprechersystem mit mehreren Rohren | [1994/13] | English: | Loudspeaker system comprising a plurality of tubes | [1994/13] | French: | Système de haut-parleur comprenant plusieurs tubes | [1994/13] | Examination procedure | 08.09.1994 | Examination requested [1994/44] | 06.03.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.07.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.07.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.11.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 09.11.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.10.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YDA]EP0429121 (PHILIPS NV [NL]) [YD] 1 * figure -; claim - * [A] 2-5; | [YA]FR2213551 (PORTELA SEIJO JUAN [ES]) [Y] 1 * figure -; claim . * [A] 6; | [A]EP0075812 (BRUNNQUELL ELEKTRO GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]US5137110 (BEDARD JR ALFRED J [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 1, line 65 - column 2, line 14; figure - *; | [A]GB2100551 (WESTERN ELECTRIC CO) [A] 1 * page 1, line 20 - line 37 * |