EP0597551 - Method and apparatus for perforating the wall of a drinking straw [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.12.1996 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.12.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.02.1997 [1997/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Verenigde Coöperatieve Melkindustrie Coberco B.A. Nieuwstad 69 NL-7201 NM Zutphen / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1994/20] | For all designated states Verenigde Coöperatieve Melkindustrie Coberco B.A. Nieuwstad 69 NL-7201 NM Zutphen / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
André, Alexander Spirea 4 NL-7421 DJ Deventer / NL | 02 /
Ebbekink, Jan Herman Winterkamperweg 16 NL-7475 SJ Markelo / NL | [1994/20] | Representative(s) | Smulders, Theodorus A.H.J., et al Vereenigde Postbus 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1994/20] | Smulders, Theodorus A.H.J., Ir., et al Vereenigde Octrooibureaux Nieuwe Parklaan 97 NL-2587 BN 's-Gravenhage / NL | Application number, filing date | 93203155.2 | 11.11.1993 | [1994/20] | Priority number, date | NL19920001975 | 11.11.1992 Original published format: NL 9201975 | [1994/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0597551 | Date: | 18.05.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0597551 | Date: | 07.02.1996 | [1996/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.03.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B26D9/00, B26F1/24 | [1994/20] | CPC: |
A47G21/18 (EP);
B26D9/00 (EP);
B26F1/0015 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, LU, NL [1994/20] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Perforieren der Wand eines Trinkhalmes | [1994/20] | English: | Method and apparatus for perforating the wall of a drinking straw | [1994/20] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour percer la paroi d'une paille | [1994/20] | Examination procedure | 23.06.1994 | Examination requested [1994/34] | 05.05.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.07.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.10.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 24.10.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.11.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US2943794 (SUSSMAN) [DA] 1 * column 2, line 44 - line 54 *; | [A]EP0174656 (TETRA PAK INTERNATIONAL AKTIEBOLAG) [A] 5 * abstract *; | [A]GB2249017 (INTERNATIONAL PRODUCT DEVELOPMENTS LIMITED); | [A]GB2032756 (TOSIO TAKAGI) |