EP0600529 - Preparation and magnetic properties of very small magnetite-dextran particles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.03.1998 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.04.1998 [1998/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NanoSystems L.L.C. 1250 South Collegeville Road, Bldg. 1 Collegeville, Pennsylvania 19426 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/24] | For all designated states NanoSystems L.L.C. 1250 South Collegeville Road Collegeville, Pennsylvania 19426 / US | ||
Former [1994/52] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650 / US | ||
Former [1994/23] | For all designated states STERLING WINTHROP INC. 90 Park Avenue New York, NY 10016 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yudelson, Joseph S., c/o STERLING WINTHROP INC. Patent Department, 90 Park Avenue New York, New York 10016 / US | [1994/23] | Representative(s) | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al Langner Parry, 52-54 High Holborn London WC1V 6RR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/41] | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al Langner Parry 52-54 High Holborn London WC1V 6RR / GB | ||
Former [1996/16] | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | ||
Former [1994/23] | Haile, Helen Cynthia, et al Kodak Limited Patent Department Headstone Drive Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | Application number, filing date | 93203162.8 | 12.11.1993 | [1994/23] | Priority number, date | US19920984611 | 02.12.1992 Original published format: US 984611 | [1994/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0600529 | Date: | 08.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0600529 | Date: | 25.10.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.09.1995 | Classification | IPC: | A61K49/00 | [1994/23] | CPC: |
B82Y25/00 (EP,KR,US);
A61K49/1803 (EP,KR,US);
A61K49/1863 (EP,KR,US);
A61K49/1866 (EP,KR,US);
B82Y5/00 (EP,US);
H01F1/0045 (EP,KR,US);
H01F1/0054 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1994/23] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung und magnetische Eigenschaften von Dextran-Magnetiten | [1994/23] | English: | Preparation and magnetic properties of very small magnetite-dextran particles | [1994/23] | French: | Préparation et propriétés magnétiques de particules très petites de dextrane-magnétite | [1994/23] | Examination procedure | 11.04.1996 | Examination requested [1996/23] | 04.07.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.12.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.05.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.10.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/17] | 05.11.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1998/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1997 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]WO8800060 (ADVANCED MAGNETICS INC [US]) [DA] 1-9 * abstract * * page 12, line 15 - page 14, line 19 * * page 21, line 5 - line 34 * * page 42, line 19 - line 32 ** page 44, line 5 - page 45, line 19; claims 2-25; table II *; | [Y]WO9001899 (ADVANCED MAGNETICS INC [US]) [Y] 9 * abstract * * page 13, line 11 - line 24 * * page 17, line 10 - page 19, line 3; claim -; table I *; | [DX] - R. WEISSLEDER ET AL., "ULTRASMALL SUPERPARAMAGNETIC IRON OXIDE: CHARACTERIZATION OF A NEW CLASS OF CONTRAST AGENTS FOR MR IMAGING", RADIOLOGY, vol. 175, no. 2, pages 489 - 493 [DX] 1-4,9 * the whole document * | [DXY] - P. KRONICK ET AL., "USE OF SUPERPARAMAGNETIC PARTICLES FOR ISOLATION OF CELLS", JOURNAL OF BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL METHODS, vol. 12, no. 1/2, doi:doi:10.1016/0165-022X(86)90052-7, pages 73 - 80, XP023454582 [DX] 1-5 * the whole document * [Y] 9 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0165-022X(86)90052-7 | [X] - M.I. PAPISOV ET AL., "MAGNETIC DRUG TARGETING.I.", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICS, vol. 40, no. 3, pages 201 - 206 [X] 1-4 * abstract * * page 202 * * page 206 * | [Y] - A. IANONNE ET AL., "BLOOD CLEARANCE OF DEXTRAN MAGNETITE PARTICLES DETERMINED BY A NONINVASIVE IN VIVO ESR METHOD", MAGNETIC RESONANCE IN MEDICINE, vol. 22, no. 2, pages 435 - 442 [Y] 9 * the whole document * | [PX] - J.W.M. BULTE ET AL., "FREQUENCY DEPENDENCE OF MR RELAXATION TIMES.II. IRON OXIDES", JMRI, vol. 3, pages 641 - 648 [PX] 1-4,9 * the whole document * |