EP0605924 - Multiplane information storage system and record carrier for use in such a system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.04.2000 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.04.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.06.2000 [2000/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1999/25] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [1998/35] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [1994/34] | For all designated states Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [1994/28] | For all designated states PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Holtslag, Antonius Hendricus Maria c/o Int. Octrooibureau B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
Visser, Derk c/o Int. Octrooibureau B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [1994/28] | Representative(s) | Visser, Derk, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1994/28] | Visser, Derk, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 93203684.1 | 24.12.1993 | [1994/28] | Priority number, date | EP19930200001 | 04.01.1993 Original published format: EP 93200001 | [1994/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0605924 | Date: | 13.07.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0605924 | Date: | 31.08.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0605924 | Date: | 23.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/24, G11B7/00 | [1994/28] | CPC: |
G11B7/005 (EP);
G11B7/24 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1994/28] | Title | German: | Mehrflächen Informationsspeichersystem und Aufzeichnungsträger zür Verwendung in einem derartigen System | [1994/28] | English: | Multiplane information storage system and record carrier for use in such a system | [1994/28] | French: | Système multi-couches de stockage d'informations et support d'informations pour utiliser dans un tel système | [1994/28] | Examination procedure | 28.02.1995 | Examination requested [1995/17] | 04.08.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 02.12.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 29.12.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.04.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 08.04.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.03.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0432731 (HITACHI LTD) [X] 1,4,14 * the whole document * [A] 2,3,5-13,16,17; | [X]US4219704 (RUSSELL) [X] 1,4 * the whole document *; | [DA]US3855426 (BOUWHUIS) [DA] * the whole document *; | [DA]DE3741910 (HITACHI LTD) [DA] * the whole document *; | [A]JPS59215034 ; | [A]EP0496132 (N V PHILIPS' GLOIELAMPENFABRIEKEN) [A] * the whole document *; | [A]EP0520619 (PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORP) [A] * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850416), vol. 9, no. 86, Database accession no. (P - 349), & JP59215034 A 19841204 (BROTHER KOGYO K K) [A] * abstract * |