EP0567205 - Use of opiate antagonists in the manufacture of agents for the diagnosis and therapy of hypothalamic function disorders [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.10.1994 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.10.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.12.1994 [1994/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ferring Arzneimittel GmbH Wittland 11 D-24109 Kiel / DE | [1993/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Leyendecker, G., Prof. Dr. med. Dieburger Strasse 209 W-6100 Darmstadt / DE | 02 /
Wildt, Ludwig, Prof. Dr. Hausdorffstrasse 136 W-5300 Bonn 1 / DE | [1993/43] | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstraße 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/43] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 D-22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 93250110.9 | 05.09.1987 | [1993/43] | Priority number, date | DE19863631088 | 12.09.1986 Original published format: DE 3631088 | [1993/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0567205 | Date: | 27.10.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.08.1993 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/485 | [1993/43] | CPC: |
A61K31/485 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1993/43] | Title | German: | Verwendung von Opiat-Antagonisten zur Herstellung von Mitteln zur Diagnose und Therapie von hypothalamischen Funktionsstörungen | [1993/43] | English: | Use of opiate antagonists in the manufacture of agents for the diagnosis and therapy of hypothalamic function disorders | [1993/43] | French: | Utilisation d'antagonistes des opiats pour la manufacture d'agents pour le diagnostic et la thérapie des troubles de la fonction hypothalamique | [1993/43] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 12.10.1993 | Examination requested [1993/49] | 06.12.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.06.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/50] | 19.07.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1994/50] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP87113006.8 / EP0263968 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1993 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   19.11.1993 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP] - GYNEKOL.RUNDSCH.(I.WIENER NALOXON SYMPOSIUM, 15. NOVEMBER 1985) Bd. 27, Nr. SUP1, Juni 1987, Seiten 47 - 55 J.C.HUBER 'KLINISCHE ERFAHRUNGEN MIT NALTREXON' | [X] - J.CLIN.PSYCHIATRY Bd. 45, Nr. 9PT2, September 1984, Seiten 20 - 24 R.L.ATKINSON 'ENDOCRINE AND METABOLIC EFFECTS OF OPIATE ANTAGONISTS' | [XP] - NIDA RES.MONOGRAPH. (PROBL. DRUG DEPEND., 16-18 JUNI 1986) Bd. 76, 1987, Seiten 116 - 123 J.H.MENDELSOHN ET AL. 'NALTREXONE STIMULATION OF PIRUITARY, ADRENAL, AND GONADAL HORMONES DURIONG THE LUTEAL PHASE OF THE MENSTRUAL CYCLE: ACUTE EFFECTS OF ALCOHOL' | [T] - NEW ENGL.J.MED. Bd. 315, Nr. 23, 4. Dezember 1986, Seiten 1459 - 1468 J.C.MARSHALL ET AL. 'GONADOTROPIN-RELEASING HORMONE: POLE OF PULSATILE SECRETION IN THE REGULATION OF REPRODUCTION' | [X] - PHARMACOL.BIOCHEM.BEHAV. Bd. 24, Nr. 2, Februar 1986, Seiten 309 - 313 J.H.MENDELSOHN 'USE OF NALTREXONE AS A PROVOCATIVE TEST FOR HYPOTHALAMIC-PITUITARY HORMONE FUNCTION' | [A] - J.PHARMACOL.EXP.THER. Bd. 213, Nr. 1, April 1980, Seiten 110 - 113 J.H.JOHNSON ET AL. 'BLOCKADE OF OVULATION BY METHADONE IN THE RAT: A CENTRAL NERVOUS SYSTEM-MEDIATED ACUTE EFFECT' | [A] - ANN.N.Y.ACAD.SCI. Bd. 438, 1984, Seiten 485 - 489 J.D.VELDHUIS ET AL. 'MODULATION OF THE PULSATILE RELEASE OF BIOLOGICALLY ACTIVE LUTEINIZING HORMONE BY ENDOGENOUS OPIATES' | [XP] - J.CLIN.ENDOCRINOL.METAB. Bd. 64, Nr. 6, Juni 1987, Seiten 1334 - 1335 L.WILDT ET AL. 'INDUCTION OF OVULATION BY THE CHRONIC ADMINISTRATION OF NALTREXONE IN HYPOTHALAMIC AMENORRHEA' | [XP] - HORM.RES. Bd. 28, Nr. 2-4, 1987, Seiten 139 - 148 G.LEYENDECKER ET AL. 'PULSATILITY OF SERUM LH IN PATHOLOGICAL CONDITIONS' | [Y] - FERTIL.STERIL. Bd. 42, Nr. 5, 1984, Seiten 683 - 685 R.JEWELEWICZ 'THE ROLE OF ENDOGENOUS OPIOID PEPTIDES IN CONTROL OF THE MENSTRUAL CYCLE' | [Y] - GYN[KOL.RUNDSCH. Bd. 25, Nr. 3, 1985, Seiten 137 - 144 B.SCHURZ ET AL. 'GONADOTROPIN-VER[NDERUNGEN UNTER NALOXONGABE' | [Y] - PEDIATR.RES. Bd. 18, Nr. 4, April 1984, Seiten 322 - 328 S.E.SAUDER ET AL. 'THE EFFECTS OF OPIATE ANTAGONISM ON GONADOTROPIN SECRETION IN CHILDREN AND IN WOMEN WITH HYPOTHALAMIC AMENORRHEA' | [Y] - J.GYNECOL.OBSTET.BIOL.REPROD. Bd. 14, Nr. 3, 1985, Seiten 301 - 303 J.ARMANI ET AL. 'EFFETS DE L'ADMINISTRATION PULSATILE DE NALOXONE SUR LA SÉCRÉTION DES GONADOTROPHINES DANS UN CAS D'AMÉNORRHÉE D'ORIGINE HYPOTHALAMO-HYPOPHYSAIRE' |