EP0580274 - Method and device for a print-out for an internal charge office [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.06.1999 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.06.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.07.1999 [1999/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Francotyp-Postalia Aktiengesellschaft & Co. Triftweg 21-26 16547 Birkenwerder / DE | [1996/27] |
Former [1994/52] | For all designated states Francotyp-Postalia GmbH Triftweg 21-26 D-16547 Birkenwerder / DE | ||
Former [1994/04] | For all designated states FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA GmbH Emmentaler Strasse 132-150 D-13409 Berlin / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Windel, Harald Laubacherstrasse 2 D-14197 Berlin / DE | 02 /
Thiel, Wolfgang, Dr. Bohnsackersteig 8 D-13503 Berlin / DE | 03 /
Dietrich, Klaus Bieselheider Weg 22A D-13465 Berlin / DE | 04 /
Knoth, Norbert Leydenallee 70 D-12167 Berlin / DE | 05 /
Simon, Erwin Bonhoefferufer 15 D-10589 Berlin / DE | 06 /
Günther, Stephan Forstweg 63a D-13465 Berlin / DE | [1994/04] | Application number, filing date | 93250215.6 | 22.07.1993 | [1994/04] | Priority number, date | DE19924224955 | 24.07.1992 Original published format: DE 4224955 | [1994/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0580274 | Date: | 26.01.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0580274 | Date: | 05.04.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0580274 | Date: | 05.08.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.02.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G07B17/02 | [1994/04] | CPC: |
G07B17/00362 (EP,US);
G07B2017/00395 (EP,US);
G07B2017/00427 (EP,US);
G07B2017/00572 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1994/04] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Anordnung für einen internen Kostenstellendruck | [1994/04] | English: | Method and device for a print-out for an internal charge office | [1994/04] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour une impression du service de prix interne | [1994/04] | Examination procedure | 02.05.1995 | Examination requested [1995/26] | 10.06.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.10.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.01.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.02.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 02.02.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.05.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5038153 (LIECHTI HANS-PETER [CH], et al) [A] 1-20 * figure 3; claim 1 *; | [A]DE3518539 (STOSCH GUENTHER, et al) [A] 1-20 * column 4, line 20 - line 36; figure 2; claim 1 *; | [A]US4611232 (SEARBY ANTHONY D [GB]) [A] 1-20 * figure 4; claim 1 *; | [A]DE3903718 (PITNEY BOWES INC [US]) [A] 1-20 * figure 7; claim 1 * |