EP0641676 - Container, particularly for storing paint or similar material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.02.2000 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DEUTSCHE AMPHIBOLIN-WERKE VON ROBERT MURJAHN GmbH + Co. KG Rossdörfer Strasse 50 64372 Ober-Ramstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/15] | For all designated states DEUTSCHE AMPHIBOLIN-WERKE VON ROBERT MURJAHN GmbH + Co. KG Rossdörfer Strasse 50 64372 Ober-Ramstadt / DE | ||
Former [1995/10] | For all designated states DEUTSCHE AMPHIBOLIN-WERKE VON ROBERT MURJAHN GmbH + Co. KG Rossdörfer Strasse 50 D-64372 Ober-Ramstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Machwirth, Franz Jochen Friedrich-Ebert Strasse, 1A 64354 Spachbrücken / DE | [1999/15] |
Former [1995/10] | 01 /
Machwirth, Franz Jochen Eberstädterstrasse 20 A D-64367 Mühltal / DE | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Joachimsthaler Straße 10-12 10719 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/10] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner Kurfürstendamm 170 D-10707 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 93250236.2 | 31.08.1993 | [1995/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0641676 | Date: | 08.03.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0641676 | Date: | 14.04.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.02.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B44D3/12, B65D77/06 | [1995/10] | CPC: |
B65D77/24 (EP);
B01F33/5011 (EP);
B44D3/12 (EP);
B44D3/128 (EP);
B65D77/06 (EP);
B01F2101/30 (EP);
B01F35/3202 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL [1995/35] |
Former [1995/10] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Gebinde, insbesondere zur Aufnahme von Farben oder dergleichen Stoffe | [1995/10] | English: | Container, particularly for storing paint or similar material | [1995/10] | French: | Récipient, spécialement pour la réception de peinture ou matériaux similaires | [1995/10] | Examination procedure | 01.09.1994 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 03.04.1995 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) DK, GR, IE, PT, SE | 11.07.1995 | Examination requested [1995/36] | 21.06.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.09.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.12.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.04.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.12.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.09.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.12.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 17.12.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.01.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 20.01.1995 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 20.01.1995 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 20.01.1995 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.01.1995 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 20.01.1995 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | |||
Former [2003/17] | MC | 31.08.1999 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3752494 (DUNN K) [A] 1,5,12,13 * column 2, line 20 - column 5, line 6 *; | [A]US4756046 (SURFACE JAMES [US], et al) [A] 1,2,4-6 * column 3, line 15 - column 5, line 20 *; | [A]WO8907532 (SUPERFOS EMBALLAGE AS [DK]) [A] 1,2,4,5,12,13 * page 2, line 1 - page 4, line 24 *; | [A]DE9005172U (JOSEF W. OSTENDORF GMBH) [A] 1-3,12,13 * page 1, paragraph 1 - page 5, paragraph 1 *; | [A]US5125565 (ROGERS EUGENE J [CA]) [A] 1* column 1, line 25 - column 2, line 14 *; | [A]US5143242 (MILLASICH DAVID S [US]) [A] 1,4 * column 2, line 33 - column 3, line 40 * |